Docket for 14-1200
No. 14-1200 | |
Title: |
Amedisys, Inc., et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi, et al. |
|
Docketed: | April 1, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-30580) |
Decision Date: | October 2, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 29, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 30 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 1, 2015) |
Apr 29 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 26, 2015. |
May 26 2015 |
Brief of respondents Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jun 9 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 25, 2015. |
Jun 9 2015 |
Reply of petitioners Amedisys, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 29 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|