Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 14-10088
No. 14-10088
Title:
David Gerard Jeep, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 4, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-1057)
  Decision Date:April 3, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:May 1, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 19 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 6, 2015)
Jul 2 2015 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Jul 9 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Oct 5 2015 Petition DENIED.
Oct 23 2015 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Nov 4 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 24, 2015.
Nov 30 2015 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
David G. Jeep General Delivery(314) 514-5228
Saint Louis, MO  63155-9999
Dave@DGJeep.com
Party name: David Gerard Jeep
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
June 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2