Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 13A687
No. 13A687
Title:
Gary R. Herbert, Governor of Utah, et al., Applicants
v.
Derek Kitchen, et al.
Docketed:December 31, 2013
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the District of Utah
  Case Nos.:(2:13-cv-217)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 31 2013 Application (13A687) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Dec 31 2013 Response to application (13A687) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due Friday, January 3, 2014, by noon EST.
Jan 3 2014 Response to application from respondent Derek Kitchen, et al. filed.
Jan 6 2014 Reply of applicant Gary R. Herbert, Governor of Utah, et al. filed.
Jan 6 2014 Application (13A687) referred to the Court.
Jan 6 2014 Application (13A687) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Sotomayor and by her referred to the Court is granted. The permanent injunction issued by the United States District Court for the District of Utah, case No. 2:13-cv-217, on December 20, 2013, is stayed pending final disposition of the appeal by the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Monte Neil Stewart Belnap Stewart Taylor & Morris, PLLC(208) 345-3333
12500 W. Explorer Drive
Suite 100
Boise, ID  83713
Party name: Gary R. Herbert, Governor of Utah, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
James E. Magleby Magleby & Greenwood, P.C.
170 South Main St., Suite 850
Salt Lake City, UT  84101
Party name: Derek Kitchen, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543