Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 13-875
No. 13-875
Title:
Robert C. Laity, Petitioner
v.
New York
Docketed:January 23, 2014
Lower Ct:Appellate Division, Supreme Court of New York, Third Judicial Department
  Case Nos.:(516176)
  Decision Date:April 11, 2013
Discretionary Court  
  Decision Date:November 19, 2013

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 20 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2014)
Mar 12 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 28, 2014.
Mar 31 2014 Petition DENIED.
Apr 11 2014 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Apr 16 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 2, 2014.
May 5 2014 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Robert C. Laity 43 Mosher Drive
Tonawanda, NY  14150-5217
Party name: Robert C. Laity

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543