Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 13-7030
No. 13-7030
Title:
David Gerard Jeep, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 23, 2013
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-2200)
  Decision Date:August 23, 2013

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 15 2013 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 22, 2013)
Nov 19 2013 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Nov 21 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 6, 2013.
Dec 9 2013 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
David G. Jeep General Delivery(314) 514-5228
Saint Louis, MO  63155-9999
Dave@DGJeep.com
Party name: David Gerard Jeep
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
June 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2