Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results

Docket for 13-1536
No. 13-1536
Lighting Ballast Control LLC, Petitioner
Universal Lighting Technologies, Inc.
Docketed:June 24, 2014
Linked with 13A1119
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(2012-1014)
  Decision Date:February 21, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 9 2014 Application (13A1119) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 22, 2014 to June 20, 2014, submitted to The Chief Justice.
May 12 2014 Application (13A1119) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 20, 2014.
Jun 20 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2014)
Jul 9 2014 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 25, 2014.
Aug 12 2014 Brief of respondent Universal Lighting Technologies, Inc. in opposition filed.
Aug 26 2014 Reply of petitioner Lighting Ballast Control LLC filed.
Aug 27 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014.
Jan 20 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 23, 2015.
Jan 26 2015 Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. v. Sandoz, Inc., 574 U. S. ___ (2015).

~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Paul D. Clement Bancroft PLLC(202) 234-0090
1919 M Street, N.W., Suite 470
Washington, DC  20036
Party name: Lighting Ballast Control LLC
Attorneys for Respondent:
Steven J. Routh Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP(202) 339-8
    Counsel of Record1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC  20005-1706
Party name: Universal Lighting Technologies, Inc.


SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543