Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 13-1424
No. 13-1424
Title:
Louisiana, ex rel. Charles J. Ballay, District Attorney for the Parish of Plaquemines, et al., Petitioners
v.
BP Exploration & Production, Inc., et al.
Docketed:May 28, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-30012)
  Decision Date:February 24, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 23 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 27, 2014)
Jun 10 2014 Waiver of right of respondent Cameron International Corporation to respond filed.
Jun 24 2014 Waiver of right of respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. to respond filed.
Jun 25 2014 Waiver of right of respondents MOEX Offshore 2007, LLC, and MOEX USA Corporation to respond filed.
Jun 25 2014 Waiver of right of respondent MJ-I Swaco to respond filed.
Jun 26 2014 Waiver of right of respondents BP America Production Company, et al. to respond filed.
Jun 27 2014 Waiver of right of respondents Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc. Transocean Deepwater Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Triton Asset Leasing Gmbh to respond filed.
Jul 16 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014.
Aug 7 2014 Response Requested . (Due September 8, 2014)
Sep 9 2014 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 15, 2014, for all respondents.
Sep 15 2014 Brief of respondents Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc. Transocean Deepwater Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Triton Asset Leasing Gmbh in opposition filed.
Sep 15 2014 Brief of respondents Anadarko Petroleum Corp. and Anadarko E&P LP in opposition filed.
Sep 15 2014 Brief of respondents BP and Moex Respondents in opposition filed.
Sep 15 2014 Brief of respondent Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. in opposition filed.
Sep 15 2014 Brief of respondent Cameron International Corporation in opposition filed.
Sep 15 2014 Brief of respondent M-I.L.L.C. in opposition filed.
Oct 1 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 17, 2014.
Oct 20 2014 Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Stephen B. Murray Jr. Murray Law Firm(504) 525-8100
650 Poydras Street
Suite 2150
New Orleans, LA  70130
smurrayjr@murray-lawfirm.com
Party name: Louisiana, ex rel. Charles J. Ballay, District Attorney for the Parish of Plaquemines, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
David J. Beck 1221 McKinney St., Ste 4500 (713) 951-3700
    Counsel of RecordHouston, TX  77010
Party name: Cameron International Corporation
 
Thomas A. Campbell Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman(713) 276-7676
    Counsel of Record909 Fannin Street, Suite 2000
Houston, TX  77010
tom.campbell@pillsburylaw.com
Party name: MOEX Offshore 2007, LLC, and MOEX USA Corporation
 
Jeffrey Bossert Clark Kirkland & Ellis LLP(202) 879-5960
    Counsel of Record655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
jeffrey.clark@kirkland.com
Party name: BP and Moex Respondents
 
Donald E. Godwin Godwin Lewis, PC(214) 939-4400
    Counsel of Record1201 Elm Street, Suite 1700
Dallas, TX  75270-2041
Party name: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
 
Allyson N. Ho Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP(214) 466-4000
    Counsel of Record1717 Main Street Suite 3200
Dallas, TX  75201
aho@morganlewis.com
Party name: MJ-I Swaco
 
David B. Salmons Bingham McCutchen LLP(202) 373-6000
    Counsel of Record2020 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
david.salmons@bingham.com
Party name: Anadarko Petroleum Corp. and Anadarko E&P LP
 
Daniel B. Levin 355 South Grand Ave. (213)-683-9135
35th Floor
Los Angeles, CA  90071
daniel.levin@mto.com
Party name: Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc. Transocean Deepwater Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Triton Asset Leasing Gmbh

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543