Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 12-7858
No. 12-7858
Title:
Trayvon Guy, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Inglewood, California, et al.
Docketed:December 21, 2012
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(08-57039)
  Decision Date:April 16, 2012
  Rehearing Denied:June 27, 2012

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 25 2012 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 22, 2013)
Jan 4 2013 Waiver of right of respondents City of Inglewood, California, et al. to respond filed.
Jan 22 2013 Waiver of right of respondent Federal Respondent to respond filed.
Feb 7 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 22, 2013.
Feb 25 2013 Petition DENIED.
Mar 22 2013 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Apr 3 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 19, 2013.
Apr 22 2013 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Eric C. Jacobson P.O. Box 67674(310) 204-0677
    Counsel of RecordLos Angeles, CA  90067
ecjla@aol.com
Party name: Trayvon Guy, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
George L. Mallory Jr. 1925 Century Park East, Suite 2000(310) 788-5555
    Counsel of RecordLos Angeles, CA  90067
Party name: City of Inglewood, California, et al.
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Federal Respondent

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543