Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 12-1252
No. 12-1252
Title:
Jefferson County Board of Education, Petitioner
v.
Phillip C., et ux., on Behalf of Their Son A. C.
Docketed:April 18, 2013
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(11-14859)
  Decision Date:November 21, 2012
  Rehearing Denied:January 17, 2013

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 16 2013 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 20, 2013)
May 8 2013 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 19, 2013.
Jun 18 2013 Brief of respondents Phillip C. and Angie C.on Behalf of Their Son A. C. in opposition filed.
Jul 2 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013.
Oct 7 2013 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Carl Edward Johnson Jr. 1910 1st Avenue North (205)-251-2881
Birmingham, AL  35203
carljohnson@bishopcolvin.com
Party name: Jefferson County Board of Education
Attorneys for Respondents:
Michael T. Kirkpatrick Public Citizen Litigation Group(202) 588-1000
    Counsel of Record1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20009
mkirkpatrick@citizen.org
Party name: Phillip C. and Angie C.on Behalf of Their Son A. C.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543