~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 10 2009 |
Application (08A794) for a stay pending appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Mar 12 2009 |
A stay of the permanent injunction issued by the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, case No. CV-07-BE-0096-E issued May 8, 2008, pending the receipt of a response to the application for stay and further order of Justice Thomas or of the Court granted by Justice Thomas. |
Mar 12 2009 |
Response to application (08A794) requested by Justice Thomas, due March 19, 2009, by 4 p.m. EDT. |
Mar 17 2009 |
Brief of the American Medical Association in support of the application for a stay filed. |
Mar 19 2009 |
Response to application from respondent Jennifer D. Alley, et al. filed. |
Mar 23 2009 |
Reply of applicant Department of Health and Human Services filed. |
Mar 25 2009 |
Application (08A794) referred to the Court. |
Mar 25 2009 |
Application (08A794) granted by the Court. The permanent injunction issued by the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, case No. CV-07-BE-0096-E, on May 8, 2008, is stayed pending final disposition of the appeal by the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit. |