Docket for 08A793
No. 08A793 | |
Title: |
Charles Williams, Applicant |
v. |
Eric H. Holder, Attorney General |
|
Docketed: | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 10 2009 |
Application (08A793) for a stay of removal pending appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Mar 13 2009 |
Response to application from respondent Eric H. Holder, Attorney General filed. |
Mar 25 2009 |
Reply of applicant Charles Williams filed. |
Mar 26 2009 |
Sur-Reply requested by The Chief Justice, due 4:30 p.m., Monday, March 30, 2009. |
Mar 30 2009 |
Sur-Reply from respondent Eric H. Holder, Attorney General filed. |
Mar 30 2009 |
Application (08A793) denied by The Chief Justice. |
|