~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 15 2007 |
Application (07A304) for stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Oct 15 2007 |
Response to application from respondent Gene M. Johnson, Director, Virginia Department of Corrections filed. |
Oct 16 2007 |
Reply of applicant Christopher Scott Emmett filed. |
Oct 17 2007 |
Application (07A304) referred to the Court by The Chief Justice. |
Oct 17 2007 |
Application (07A304) granted by the Court. The execution of sentence of death is stayed pending final disposition of the appeal by the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit or further order of this Court. |
Apr 23 2008 |
Motion to vacate the order entered by the Court on October 17, 2007, filed by respondent Gene M. Johnson, Director, Virginia Department of Corrections. |
Apr 28 2008 |
Response to motion from applicant Christopher Scott Emmett filed. |
Apr 29 2008 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 15, 2008. |
May 2 2008 |
Reply of respondent Gene M. Johnson, Director, Virginia Department of Corrections to motion to vacate stay of execution filed. (Distributed) |
May 19 2008 |
Motion to vacate the stay of execution of sentence of death issued by the Court on October 17, 2007, GRANTED. Justice Stevens, Justice Souter and Justice Ginsburg dissent. (Detached Opinion) |