Docket for 07-8843
No. 07-8843 | |
Title: |
Sollog Immanuel Adonai-Adoni, Petitioner |
v. |
Leon A. King, Commissioner, Philadelphia Prison System, et al. |
|
Docketed: | January 17, 2008 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (07-2695) |
Decision Date: | November 8, 2007 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 17, 2007 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 10 2008 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 19, 2008) |
Mar 6 2008 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 21, 2008. |
Mar 24 2008 |
Petition DENIED. |
|