Docket for 07-1180
No. 07-1180 | |
Title: |
Defenders of Wildlife, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Michael Chertoff, Secretary of Homeland Security |
|
Docketed: | March 18, 2008 |
Lower Ct: | United States District Court for the District of Columbia |
Case Nos.: | (07-1801) |
Decision Date: | December 18, 2007 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 17 2008 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2008) |
Apr 10 2008 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 19, 2008. |
Apr 17 2008 |
Brief amici curiae of Fourteen Members of the U.S. House of Representatives filed. |
Apr 17 2008 |
Brief amicus curiae of National Advocacy Center of the Sisters of the Good Shepherd, et al. filed. |
Apr 17 2008 |
Appendix of Barr, Michael H. William D. Araiza, and Other Constitutional and Administrative Law Professors filed. |
Apr 17 2008 |
Brief amici curiae of William D. Araiza, and Other Constitutional and Administrative Law Professors filed. |
May 12 2008 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 23, 2008. |
May 23 2008 |
Brief of respondent Michael Chertoff, Secretary of Homeland Security in opposition filed. |
Jun 3 2008 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 19, 2008. |
Jun 3 2008 |
Reply of petitioners Defenders of Wildlife, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 23 2008 |
Petition DENIED. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | | |
Dan M. Kahan |
Yale Law School | (203) 432-4800 |
| Supreme Court Clinic | |
| 127 Wall Street | |
| New Haven, CT 06511 | |
Party name: Defenders of Wildlife, et al. |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
Gregory G. Garre |
Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
|
United States Department of Justice | |
| 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20530-0001 | |
Party name: Michael Chertoff, Secretary of Homeland Security |
Other: | | |
Michael H. Barr |
Sonnenschein Nath & Rosenthal LLP | (212) 768-6788 |
| 1221 Avenue of the Americas | |
| New York, NY 10020 | |
Party name: William D. Araiza, and Other Constitutional and Administrative Law Professors |
| | |
Dinah Bear |
4019 18th Street, NW | 22029069407 |
| Washington, DC 20011-5324 | |
Party name: National Advocacy Center of the Sisters of the Good Shepherd, et al. |
| | |
Alan E. Untereiner |
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP | (202) 775-4500 |
| 1801 K Street, N.W., Suite 411 | |
| Washington, DC 20006 | |
| auntereiner@robbinsrussell.com |
Party name: Fourteen Members of the U.S. House of Representatives |