Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 07-11115
No. 07-11115
Title:
David G. Jeep, Petitioner
v.
Philip E. Jones, Sr., et al.
Docketed:May 28, 2008
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(07-2614)
  Decision Date:February 28, 2008

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 22 2008 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 27, 2008)
Jul 10 2008 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2008.
Oct 6 2008 Petition DENIED.
Oct 31 2008 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Dec 23 2008 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 16, 2009.
Jan 21 2009 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
David G. Jeep General Delivery(314) 514-5228
Saint Louis, MO  63155-9999
Dave@DGJeep.com
Party name: David G. Jeep

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543