Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 06-5774
No. 06-5774
Title:
David A. Bowers, Petitioner
v.
Nathaniel Quarterman, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:August 9, 2006
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(05-20782)
  Decision Date:May 9, 2006

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 2 2006 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 8, 2006)
Sep 21 2006 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 6, 2006.
Oct 10 2006 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
David A. Bowers #913919
625 Easley Street
Fort Worth, TX  76108
Party name: David A. Bowers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543