Docket for 03-796
No. 03-796 | |
Title: |
Arnold Eisen, Petitioner |
v. |
George W. Bush, President of the United States, et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 3, 2003 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (02-4507) |
Decision Date: | September 18, 2003 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 18 2003 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 2, 2004) |
Dec 29 2003 |
Waiver of right of respondents George W. Bush, President of the United States, et al. to respond filed. |
Jan 7 2004 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 23, 2004. |
Jan 26 2004 |
Petition DENIED. |
|