Docket for 03-5370
No. 03-5370 | |
Title: |
Edsel David Barnes, Jr., aka Wildman, Petitioner |
v. |
George W. Bush, President of the United States, et al. |
|
Docketed: | July 16, 2003 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (02-6057) |
Decision Date: | January 31, 2003 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 11, 2003 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 11 2003 |
Petition for writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 15, 2003) |
Aug 5 2003 |
Waiver of right of respondent George W. Bush, President of the United States, et al. to respond filed. |
Aug 14 2003 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2003. |
Oct 6 2003 |
Petition DENIED. |
|