Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 02-633
No. 02-633 Status: DECIDED
Title: Mattel, Inc., Petitioner
v.
MCA Records, Inc., et al.
Docketed:          Lower Ct: United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
October 25, 2002 (98-56577)

~~Date~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 22 2002Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 24,
2002)
Nov 20 2002 Order extending time to file response to petition until December
24, 2002.
Dec 23 2002Brief of respondents MCA Records, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Jan 6 2003Reply brief of petitioner Mattel, Inc. (TBP) filed.
Jan 8 2003 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 24, 2003
Jan 27 2003 Petition DENIED.
********************************************************
 


~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Seth P. Waxman Wilmer, Cutler & Pickering 2026636000
2445 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20037
Party name: Mattel, Inc.
 
Attorneys for Respondent:
Russell J. Frackman Mitchell, Silberberg & Knupp 3103122000
11377 W. Olympic Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA 90064-1683
Party name: MCA Records, Inc., et al.
 
 

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543