Docket for 02-1263
No. 02-1263 |
Status: | DECIDED |
| Title: |
Leo Wanta, Somalia Ambassador to Canada and Switzerland, aka |
| | Lee E. Wanta, aka Leo E. Wanta, Petitioner |
| | v. |
| |
Richard G. Chandler, Secretary, Wisconsin Department of |
| | Revenue, et al. |
Docketed: | Lower Ct: |
United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
February 27, 2003 | |
(02-1544) |
~~Date~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 24 2003 | Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 29, 2003) |
Mar 13 2003 | Waiver of right of respondents Richard G. Chandler, Secretary, WI |
| Dept. of Revenue, et al. to respond filed. |
Mar 13 2003 | Waiver of right of respondents John D. Ashcroft, Attorney General, et |
| al. to respond filed. |
Apr 16 2003 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 2, 2003 |
May 5 2003 | Petition DENIED. |
| ******************************************************** |
| |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Steven Dwain Goodwin | Goodwin, Sutton & Duval, PLC | 8046430000 |
| 1001 East Broad St., Suite 350 | |
| Richmond, VA 23219 | |
Party name: Leo Wanta |
| | |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
Bruce A. Olsen | Office of the Attorney General | 6082662580 |
| P.O. Box 7857 | |
| Madison, WI 53707-7857 | |
Party name: Richard G. Chandler, Secretary, et al. |
| | |
Solicitor General | U.S. Department of Justice | |
| Washington, DC 20530 | |
Party name: John D. Ashcroft, Attorney General, et al. |
| | |
| | |
|