Docket for 01-10548
No. 01-10548 |
Status: | DECIDED |
| Title: |
Dolan Darling, Petitioner |
| | v. |
| |
Florida |
Docketed: | Lower Ct: |
Supreme Court of Florida |
June 4, 2002 | |
(SC94691) |
~~Date~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 13 2002 | Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 5, 2002) |
May 13 2002 | Motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. |
Jul 3 2002 | Order extending time to file response to petition until August 5, |
| 2002. |
Aug 5 2002 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. |
Aug 15 2002 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2002 |
Sep 4 2002 | Reply requested (Due September 16, 2002) |
Sep 13 2002 | Reply brief of petitioner Sean H. Smith filed. |
Oct 7 2002 | Petition DENIED. |
| ******************************************************** |
| |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Christopher Quarles | 112 Orange Avenue | 3862523367 |
| Suite A | |
| Daytona Beach, FL 32114 | |
Party name: Sean Smith |
| | |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
Douglas T. Squire | Office of the Attorney General | 3862384990 |
| 444 Seabreeze Blvd., 5th Fl. | |
| Daytona Beach, FL 32118 | |
Party name: Florida |
| | |
| | |
|