Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-696
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-696
Title:Colorado Republican State Central Committee, Petitioner
v.
Norma Anderson, et al.
Docketed:December 28, 2023
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(23SA300)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 27 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 29, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2023Motion of petitioner to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari and to expedite merits briefing and oral arugment in the event the petition is granted filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 28 2023Motion of the Anderson respondents to expedite briefing on the petition for a writ of certiorari and for expedited merits briefing if the petition is granted filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 28 2023Response of the Anderson respondents to petitioner's motion to expedite filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 02 2024Brief of respondent Jena Griswold, Secretary of State of Colorado in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 02 2024Brief of respondents Norma Anderson, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2024Brief amici curiae of Senator Steve Daines & National Republican Senatorial Committee filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2024Waiver of right of respondent Donald J. Trump to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation and Hans von Spakovsky filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of Brian J. Martin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2024Reply of petitioner Colorado Republican State Central Committee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2024Brief amici curiae of 45 Colorado Registered Electors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: Colorado Republican State Central Committee
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Donald J. Trump
LeeAnn Morrill
    Counsel of Record
Colorado Attorney General's Office
1300 Broadway, 6th Floor
Ralph L. Carr Colorado Judicial Center
Denver, CO 80203

leeann.morrill@coag.gov
720-508-6000
Party name: Jena Griswold, Secretary of State of Colorado
Jason Clifford Murray
    Counsel of Record
Olson Grimsley Kawanabe Hinchcliff & Murray, LLC
700 17th St.
Suite 1600
Denver, CO 80202

jmurray@olsongrimsley.com
3035359157
Party name: Norma Anderson, et al.
Other
John Christian Adams
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
107 S. West Street
700
Alexandria, VA 22314

adams@publicinterestlegal.org
703-745-5870
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation and Hans von Spakovsky
John Matthew Gore
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

JMGORE@JONESDAY.COM
2028793939
Party name: Senator Steve Daines & National Republican Senatorial Committee
Wallace K. Lightsey
    Counsel of Record
Wyche P.A.
200 East Broad Street, Suite 400
Greenville, SC 29601

wlightsey@wyche.com
864-242-8200
Party name: Brian J. Martin
J. Gregory Troutman
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Law Office, PLLC.
4205 Springhurst Boulevard
Suite 201
Louisville, KY 40241

JGTATTY@YAHOO.COM
502-412-9179
Party name: 45 Colorado Registered Electors

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543