Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-601
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-601
Title:John and Jane Parents 1, et al., Petitioners
v.
Montgomery County Board of Education, et al.
Docketed:December 5, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-2034)
   Decision Date:August 14, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 13 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 4, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2023Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Faith and Family in Support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2024Waiver of right of respondents Montgomery County Board of Education, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Liberty Justice Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2024Brief amici curiae of Professor S. Ernie Walton, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2024Brief amici curiae of West Virginia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of America First Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 04 2024Amicus brief of National Association of Parents, Inc. dba ParentsUSA submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 10 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Jan 16 2024Response Requested. (Due February 15, 2024)
Jan 17 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 15, 2024 to March 18, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 18 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 18, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
655 Fifteenth St., NW, Ste. 425
Washington, DC 20005

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: John and Jane Parents 1, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8800
Party name: Montgomery County Board of Education, et al.
Other
David Stanley DeLugas
    Counsel of Record
National Association of Parents, Inc.
1600 Parkwood Circle
Suite 200
Atlanta, GA 30339

david.delugas@parentsusa.org
4043144536
Party name: National Association of Parents, Inc. dba ParentsUSA
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
111 Magnolia Lane
Hubert, NC 28539

LAWYERDEBORAH@OUTLOOK.COM
9103264554
Party name: Institute for Faith and Family in Support
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Christopher Theodore Holinger
    Counsel of Record
Robertson Center for Constitutional Law
Regent University School of Law
1000 Regent University Drive
Virginia Beach, VA 23464

chriho3@mail.regent.edu
7576976488
Party name: S. Ernie Walton and Eric DeGroff
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells Street, Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

JHUEBERT@ljc.org
312-637-2280
Party name: The Liberty Justice Center, Wisconsin Institute For Law & Liberty and Dr. Erica Anderson.
Reed Darrow Rubinstein
    Counsel of Record
America First Legal Foundation
300 Independence Ave SE
Washington, DC 20003

reed.rubinstein@aflegal.org
202-964-3721
Party name: America First Legal Foundation
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

TSANDEFUR@GOLDWATERINSTITUTE.ORG
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
First Liberty Institute, 2001 W Plano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty, American Hindu Coalition, Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team, Christian Legal Society, and Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission
Michael Ray Williams
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
State Capitol Complex, Bldg. 1, Rm E-26
1900 Kanawha Blvd. E
Charleston, WV 25305

michael.r.williams@wvago.gov
(681) 313-4511
Party name: State of West Virginia and 16 Other States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543