Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22O154
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22O154
Title:New Hampshire, Plaintiff
v.
Massachusetts
Docketed:October 23, 2020
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 19 2020Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Motion for Leave to File a Bill of ComplaintCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Edward A. Zelinsky filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Brief of defendant Massachusetts in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of Ohio and nine other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Taxpayers Union Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2020Reply of plaintiff New Hampshire filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of States of New Jersey, Connecticut, Hawaii and Iowa filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Jan 25 2021The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiff
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
(617) 227-0548
Party name: New Hampshire
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Napier Dewar
    Counsel of Record
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

bessie.dewar@mass.gov
617-963-2204
Party name: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Other
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: States of Ohio, Arkansas, Indiana, Kentucky, Louisiana, Missouri, Nebraska, Oklahoma, Texas, and Utah
Edward A. Zelinsky
    Counsel of Record
55 Fifth Avenue
Room 941
New York, NY 10003

edward.a.zelinsky@gmail.com
(203) 787-4991
Party name: Professor Edward A. Zelinsky
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075-7509

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Jay Randall Carson
    Counsel of Record
Wegman Hessler
6055 Rockside Woods Blvd., Suite 200
Cleveland, OH 44131

jrcarson@wegmanlaw.com
2166423342
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Joseph Darcy Henchman
    Counsel of Record
National Taxpayers Union Foundation
122 C Street N.W.
#650
Washington, DC 20001

jbh@ntu.org
2027665019
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation, et al.
Jeremy Michael Feigenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Office of the New Jersey Attorney General
25 Market Street
Trenton, NJ 08625

jeremy.feigenbaum@njoag.gov
6092924925
Party name: States of New Jersey, Connecticut, Hawii and Iowa

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543