Jun 07 2007 | Documents filed with the Special Master are available at https://www.supremecourt.gov/SpecMastRpt/Orig138.aspx |
| |
Jun 08 2007 | Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed. (Response due August 7, 2007) |
| |
Jun 08 2007 | Application (06A1150) preliminary injunction, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
| |
Jun 12 2007 | Response to Application requested by the Chief Justice due on or before August 7, 2007. |
| |
Aug 07 2007 | Brief of respondent North Carolina in opposition filed. |
| |
Aug 07 2007 | Response to application from respondent North Carolina filed. |
| |
Aug 22 2007 | Application (06A1150) referred to the Court by The Chief Justice. |
| |
Aug 22 2007 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2007. |
| |
Aug 22 2007 | Reply to response to application for preliminary injunction from South Carolina filed. (Distributed) |
| |
Aug 22 2007 | Reply of petitioner South Carolina, Plaintiff filed. (Distributed) |
| |
Oct 01 2007 | Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint GRANTED. Defendant is allowed thirty days within which to file an answer. |
| |
Oct 01 2007 | Application (06A1150) denied by the Court |
| |
Oct 24 2007 | Order extending time to file an answer to and including November 30, 2007. |
| |
Nov 30 2007 | Motion for leave to intervene filed by Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC. |
| |
Nov 30 2007 | Answer to Bill of Complaint filed by North Carolina |
| |
Nov 30 2007 | Motion for leave to intervene filed by Catawba River Water Supply Project. |
| |
Dec 11 2007 | Opposition to Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC's motion to intervene filed by South Carolina, Plaintiff . (Distributed) |
| |
Dec 12 2007 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 4, 2008. |
| |
Dec 13 2007 | Opposition to The Catawba River Water Supply Project's motion to intervene filed by South Carolina, Plaintiff. (Distributed) |
| |
Dec 14 2007 | Reply Brief in Support of the Motion of the Catawba River Water Supply Project for leave to intervene filed. (Distributed) |
| |
Dec 19 2007 | Reply Brief in Support of the Motion of Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC for leave to intervene filed. (Distributed) |
| |
Jan 07 2008 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 11, 2008. |
| |
Jan 15 2008 | Kristin Linsley Myles, Esq., of San Francisco, California, is appointed Special Master in this case with authority to fix the time and conditions for the filing of additional pleadings, to direct subsequent proceedings, to summon witnesses, to issue subpoenas, and to take such evidence as may be introduced and such as she may deem it necessary to call for. The Special Master is directed to submit Reports as she may deem appropriate. The compensation of the Special Master, the allowances to her, the compensation paid to her legal, technical, stenographic and clerical assistants, the cost of printing her Reports, and all other proper expenses, including travel expenses, shall be charged against and be borne by the parties in such proportion as the Court may hereafter direct.
. |
| |
Jan 15 2008 | Motion for leave to intervene filed by Catawba River Water Supply Project is referred to the Special Master. |
| |
Jan 15 2008 | Motion for leave to intervene filed by Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC is referred to the Special Master. |
| |
Feb 13 2008 | Motion for leave to intervene filed by City of Charlotte, North Carolina. |
| |
Feb 25 2008 | Response to City of Charlotte's motion for leave to intervene and file answer filed by respondent North Carolina. |
| |
Feb 25 2008 | Opposition to City of Charlotte's motion for leave to intervene by South Carolina, Plaintiff filed. |
| |
Feb 27 2008 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 14, 2008. |
| |
Mar 11 2008 | Reply Brief in Support of the Motion of the City of Charlotte, North Carolina for leave to intervene filed. (Distributed) |
| |
Mar 17 2008 | The motion of City of Charlotte, North Carolina for leave to intervene is referred to the Special Master. |
| |
Nov 28 2008 | First Interim Report of the Special Master filed. |
| |
Dec 03 2008 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2009. |
| |
Dec 09 2008 | Motion for leave to file exceptions to First Interim Report of the Special Master and Brief in Support of its Motion for Leave to File Exceptions filed by petitioner South Carolina, Plaintiff. (Distributed) |
| |
Dec 09 2008 | Letter filed by Catawba River Water Supply Project. (Distributed) |
| |
Dec 18 2008 | Intervenors' Response to the Motion of the State of South Carolina for Leave to File Exceptions to the First Interim Report of the Special Master. (Distributed) |
| |
Dec 19 2008 | Response to South Carolina's Motion to File Exceptions to the Special Master's First Interim Report filed by respondent North Carolina. (Distributed) |
| |
Dec 22 2008 | Reply of plaintiff South Carolina in Support of its Motion to File Exceptions to First Interim Report of the Special Master, filed. (Distributed) |
| |
Jan 09 2009 | The Report of the Special Master is received and ordered filed. The motion for leave to file exceptions to First Interim Report of the Special Master is GRANTED. Parties and intervenors may file exceptions to the Report, with supporting briefs, on or before 2 p.m. Friday, February 13, 2009. Reply briefs, if any, are to be filed on or before 2 p.m. Monday, March 9, 2009. Sur-reply briefs, if any, are to be filed on or before 2 p.m. Monday, March 23, 2009. |
| |
Feb 13 2009 | Exceptions of the State of South Carolina to First Interim Report of the Special Master filed. |
| |
Feb 13 2009 | Letter filed by Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC. |
| |
Feb 13 2009 | Letter filed by Catawba River Water Supply Project. |
| |
Feb 23 2009 | Brief amicus curiae in support of Plaintiff's exceptions filed by the United States. |
| |
Mar 09 2009 | Reply of respondent North Carolina in opposition to Plaintiff's exceptions filed. |
| |
Mar 09 2009 | Reply of Catawba River Water Supply Project to Exceptions of South Carolina filed. |
| |
Mar 09 2009 | Reply of the City of Charlotte, North Carolina in response to Exceptions of South Carolina filed. |
| |
Mar 09 2009 | Reply of Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC to South Carolina's Exceptions filed. |
| |
Mar 10 2009 | Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. |
| |
Mar 17 2009 | Application (08A817) for leave to file sur-reply in support of exceptions to first interim report of the special master in excess of word limitation, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
| |
Mar 17 2009 | Application (08A817) denied by The Chief Justice. |
| |
Mar 23 2009 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2009. |
| |
Mar 23 2009 | Sur-Reply Brief of the State of South Carollina in support of Exceptions to First Interim Report of the Special Master filed. (Distributed) |
| |
Mar 23 2009 | Motion for divided argument filed by defendant North Carolina and intervenors Duke energy Carolinas, LLC, Catawba River Water Supply Project and City of Charlotter, NC. (Distributed) |
| |
Mar 30 2009 | The Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master are set for oral argument in due course. |
| |
Apr 20 2009 | Motion for divided argument filed by defendant and intervenors DENIED and the time is divided as follows: 10 minutes to defendant, and 20 minutes to intervenors. |
| |
Apr 20 2009 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. |
| |
Jul 17 2009 | CIRCULATED. |
| |
Sep 21 2009 | All Record Materials are available on the Special Master's website at www.mto.com/sm/ |
| |
Oct 06 2009 | SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, October 13, 2009. |
| |
Oct 13 2009 | Argued. On Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master. For plaintiff: David C. Frederick, Washington, D.C.; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For interveners: H. Christopher Bartolomucci, Washington, D.C. For defendant: Christopher G. Browning, Jr., Solicitor General, Raleigh, N.C. |
| |
Jan 20 2010 | Exceptions to Special Master's First Interim Report overruled in part and sustained in part. Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Stevens, Scalia, Kennedy, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Roberts, C. J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment in part and dissenting in part, in which Thomas, Ginsburg, and Sotomayor, JJ., joined. |
| |
Dec 14 2010 | Stipulation to dismiss the Bill of Complaint pursuant to Rule 46 received. |
| |
Dec 14 2010 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |
| |
Jan 10 2011 | Kristin Linsley Myles, Esq., of San Francisco, California, the Special Master in this case, is hereby discharged with the thanks of the Court. |
| |