Docket for 22O132
|
Jun 02 2002 | Documents filed with the Special Master are available at http://docs.law.gwu.edu/facweb/bclark/ | | | Jun 03 2002 | Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed. | | | Aug 05 2002 | Brief of respondent North Carolina in opposition filed. | | | Aug 21 2002 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2002. | | | Aug 21 2002 | Reply of petitioner Alabama, et al., Plaintiffs filed. | | | Oct 07 2002 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. | | | Apr 22 2003 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. | | | Apr 30 2003 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Alabama, et al., Plaintiffs filed. | | | May 01 2003 | Supplemental brief of respondent North Carolina filed. | | | May 06 2003 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 22, 2003. | | | May 27 2003 | REDISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 29, 2003. | | | Jun 02 2003 | REDISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 5, 2003. | | | Jun 12 2003 | REDISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 12, 2003. | | | Jun 16 2003 | Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint GRANTED. Defendant is allowed thirty days within which to file an answer. | | | Jul 01 2003 | Order extending time to file an answer to the bill of complaint to and including August 15, 2003. | | | Aug 15 2003 | Answer to Bill of Complaint filed by North Carolina | | | Aug 15 2003 | Motion to dismiss filed by respondent North Carolina. | | | Aug 20 2003 | Order extending time to file a response to the motion to dismiss to and including September 24, 2003. | | | Sep 24 2003 | Response to motion to dismiss from petitioner Alabama, et al., Plaintiffs filed. | | | Oct 07 2003 | Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss of respondent North Carolina filed. | | | Oct 08 2003 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 31, 2003. | | | Nov 03 2003 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 7, 2003. | | | Nov 10 2003 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 14, 2003. | | | Nov 17 2003 | IT IS ORDERED that Bradford R. Clark, Esquire, of Washington, D.C., be appointed as Special Master in this case with authority to fix the time and conditions for the filing of additional pleadings and to direct subsequent proceedings, and with authority to summon witnesses, issue subpoenas, and take such evidence as may be introduced and such as he may deem it necessary to call for. The Special Master is directed to submit such Reports as he may deem appropriate. The compensation of the Special Master, the allowances to him, the compensation paid to his legal, technical, stenographic and clerical assistants, the cost of printing his Reports, and all other proper expenses, including travel expenses, shall be charged against and be borne by the parties in such proportion as the Court may hereafter direct. | | | Dec 26 2006 | Motion for fees and reimbusement of expenses for the period November 17, 2003 through October 31, 2006. filed by Special Master. | | | Jan 10 2007 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 16, 2007. | | | Feb 20 2007 | Motion for fees and reimbursement of expenses for the period November 17, 2003 through October 31, 2006. GRANTED | | | Apr 02 2009 | Preliminary Report and Second Report of the Special Master Received | | | Apr 08 2009 | Reports of the Special Master DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 24, 2009. | | | Apr 27 2009 | The Reports of the Special Master are received and ordered filed. Exceptions to the Reports, with supporting briefs, may be filed within 45 days. Replies, if any, with supporting briefs, may be filed within 30 days. Sur-reply briefs, if any, may be filed within 30 days. | | | May 19 2009 | The joint request for an extension of time has been granted. Exceptions to the Reports are due on or before June 24, 2009; Amicus Briefs are due on or before July 15, 2009; Replies are due on or before August, 10, 2009; Sur-replies are due on or before September 9, 2009. | | | Jun 25 2009 | Exceptions by Plaintiffs to the Preliminary and Second Reports of The Special Master and Brief in Support of Exceptions filed. | | | Jun 25 2009 | Exceptions of the State of North Carolina to the Reports of the Special Master and Brief in Support of Exceptions filed. | | | Jul 15 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. | | | Jul 15 2009 | Brief amici curiae of Rocky Mt Low-Level Radioactive Waste Compact Board, et al., filed. | | | Aug 10 2009 | The State of North Carolina's Reply to Exceptions by Plaintiffs to the Reports of the Special Master filed. | | | Aug 10 2009 | Reply to North Carolina's Exceptions to the Preliminary and Second Reports of the Special Master filed by Alabama, et al. | | | Aug 17 2009 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. | | | Sep 09 2009 | Sur-Reply of defendant North Carolina filed. | | | Sep 09 2009 | Sur-Reply of Alabama, et al., Plaintiffs filed. | | | Sep 16 2009 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 9, 2009. | | | Oct 13 2009 | The Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master are set for oral argument in due course. | | | Oct 22 2009 | Joint motion for enlargement of time for oral argument filed by the parties. | | | Nov 02 2009 | SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, January 11, 2010. | | | Nov 02 2009 | CIRCULATED. | | | Nov 09 2009 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. | | | Nov 09 2009 | Motion of the parties for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED and the time is allocated as follows: 30 minutes for plaintiffs, 10 minutes for the Solicitor General, 40 minutes for defendant, and 10 minutes for plaintiffs. | | | Dec 22 2009 | Record received from Special Master Bradford R. Clark. (4 boxes) | | | Jan 11 2010 | Argued. On Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master. For plaintiffs: Carter G. Phillips, Washington, D.C. For United States as amicus curiae: Edward S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. For defendant: Walter Dellinger, Washington, D.C. | | | Jun 01 2010 | On Exceptions to the Preliminary and Second Reports of the Special Master. Scalia, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Stevens, Ginsburg, and Alito, JJ., joined, in which Roberts, C.J., joined in all but Parts II-D and III-B, in which Kennedy and Sotomayor, JJ., joined in all but Part II-E, in which Thomas, J., joined in all but Part III-B, and in which Breyer, J., joined in all but parts II-C, II-D, and II-E. Kennedy, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment, in which Sotomayor, J., joined. Roberts, C. J., filed an opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part, in which Thomas, J., joined. Breyer, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part, in which Roberts, C. J., joined. | | | Jul 09 2010 | Motion for fees and reimbursement of expenses for the period November 1, 2006 through June 30, 2010 filed by Special Master. (CL Page 163) | | | Jul 21 2010 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2010. | | | Oct 04 2010 | The motion of the Special Master for allowance of fees and reimbursement of expenses is granted, and the Special Master is awarded a total of $80,904.16 for the period November 1, 2006 through June 30, 2010, to be paid equally by the parties. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. | | | Dec 23 2010 | Stipulation to dismiss the Bill of Complaint pursuant to Rule 46 received. | | | Dec 27 2010 | Motion for fees and reimbursement of expenses for the period July 1, 2010, through December 31, 2010, filed by Special Master. | | | Dec 28 2010 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 14, 2011. | | | Jan 18 2011 | The motion of the Special Master for allowance of fees and reimbursement of expenses is granted, and the Special Master is awarded a total of $6312.50 for the period July 1, 2010, through December 31, 2010, to be paid equally by the parties. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. | | | Jan 18 2011 | Bill of Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 46. | | | Jan 24 2011 | Bradford R. Clark, Esquire, of Washington, D.C., the Special Master in this case, is hereby discharged with the thanks of the Court. | | |
|