Jul 14 1922 | Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed. |
| |
Dec 01 1980 | ORDER: On Bills in Equity. Paragraphs 3 and 5 of the Decree entered June 12,
1967, amended. Marshall, J. (OUT). |
| |
Dec 21 2009 | DOCKET ENTRIES FROM 7/15/1922 to 11/30/1980 ARE OMITTED. |
| |
Dec 21 2009 | Motion To Reopen and for a Supplemental Decree, Petition, and Brief and Appendix in Support of Motion filed by State of Michigan, Plaintiff. |
| |
Dec 21 2009 | Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Michigan, Plaintiff. |
| |
Dec 23 2009 | Memorandum of State of Ohio in support of Michigan's Motion to Reopen, filed. |
| |
Dec 28 2009 | Brief of Minnesota in support of Michigan's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed. |
| |
Dec 30 2009 | Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Wisconsin. |
| |
Dec 31 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Ontario in support of the Sate of Michigan's Motion for a Preliminary Injuntion filed. |
| |
Dec 31 2009 | Response to motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by New York. |
| |
Jan 05 2010 | Memorandum for the United States in Opposition to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed. |
| |
Jan 05 2010 | Response to motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago. |
| |
Jan 05 2010 | Response to motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Illinois. |
| |
Jan 11 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2010. |
| |
Jan 12 2010 | Brief of Pennsylvania in support of Michigan's motion to reopen filed. |
| |
Jan 19 2010 | Motion For Preliminary Injunction DENIED. |
| |
Jan 19 2010 | Letter received from the Solicitor General |
| |
Feb 04 2010 | Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Michigan, Plaintiff. |
| |
Feb 16 2010 | Memorandum of State of Pennsylvania in support of Michigan's Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed. |
| |
Feb 17 2010 | Order extending time to file response to Motion to Reopen to and including March 22, 2010, for all respondents. |
| |
Feb 17 2010 | Order extending time to file the Solicitor General's response to the renewed motion for a preliminary injunction to and including February 25, 2010. |
| |
Feb 19 2010 | Brief amicus curiae of Alliance for the Great Lakes National Wildlife Federation, et al. filed. |
| |
Feb 19 2010 | Brief amicus curiae of Michigan Shoreline Caucus filed. |
| |
Feb 19 2010 | Brief amicus curiae of Indiana filed. |
| |
Feb 19 2010 | Brief of New York, Minnesota, and Wisconsin in support of motion to reopen and renewed motion for a preliminary injunction filed. |
| |
Feb 23 2010 | Response to renewed motion for preliminary injunction filed by Illinois. |
| |
Feb 24 2010 | Response to renewed motion for preliminary injunction filed by Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago. |
| |
Feb 25 2010 | Memorandum for the United States in Opposition to the renewed motion for preliminary injunction filed. |
| |
Mar 03 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 19, 2010. |
| |
Mar 18 2010 | Brief of respondent Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago in opposition filed. |
| |
Mar 22 2010 | Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction DENIED. |
| |
Mar 22 2010 | Brief of United States in opposition filed. |
| |
Mar 22 2010 | Brief of respondent Illinois in opposition filed. |
| |
Apr 01 2010 | Reply of State of Michigan, Plaintiff filed. |
| |
Apr 07 2010 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 23, 2010. |
| |
Apr 26 2010 | Motion of Michigan To Reopen and for a Supplemental Decree DENIED. The alternative motion for leave to file a bill of complaint is DENIED. |
| |