Docket for 22-880
|
Jan 18 2023 | Application (22A652) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 16, 2023 to April 17, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 20 2023 | Application (22A652) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 17, 2023. | | | Mar 10 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2023) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2023 to May 15, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 15, 2023. | | | Apr 13 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 13 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 13 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 15 2023 | Brief of respondents Janet L. Yellen, Secretary of the Treasury, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 22 2023 | Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner. | | Main Document | May 22 2023 | Reply of petitioner Ohio filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 23 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/8/2023. | | | Jun 12 2023 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh would grant the petition for a writ of certiorari. | | |
|