Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-7386
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-7386
Title:Louis McIntosh, aka Lou D, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 27, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-1908)
   Decision Date:January 25, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 24 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 30, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixProof of Service
May 22 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 30, 2023 to June 29, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 23 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 29, 2023.
Jun 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 29, 2023 to July 31, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 09 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 31, 2023.
Jul 31 2023Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 17 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Sep 29 2023Motion of petitioner to proceed in forma pauperis granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Oct 11 2023Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Oct 17 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including November 27, 2023. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 10, 2024.
Nov 27 2023Brief of petitioner Louis McIntosh filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of New York Council of Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, February 27, 2024.
Jan 10 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit.
Jan 10 2024Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 11 2024CIRCULATED.
Jan 11 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. The record is electronic and is available with the Clerk.
Jan 24 2024Record received from the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York (one envelope).
Feb 09 2024Reply of petitioner Louis McIntosh filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Argued. For petitioner: Steven Y. Yurowitz, New York, N. Y. For respondent: Matthew Guarnieri, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Y. Yurowitz
    Counsel of Record
Newman & Greenberg
950 Third Avenue
31st Floor
New York, NY 10022

SYUROWITZ@NEWMANGREENBERG.COM
212-308-7900
Party name: Louis McIntosh
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Noam Korati Biale
    Counsel of Record
Sher Tremonte LLP
90 Broad Street, 23rd Floor
New York, NY 10004

nbiale@shertremonte.com
212-202-2600
Party name: New York Council of Defense Lawyers
Steven Leigh Kessler
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Steven L. Kessler
500 Mamaroneck Avenue
Suite 320
Harrison, NY 10528-1600

KesslerLawNYC@gmail.com
212-661-1500
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543