Docket for 22-585
 | |
|
Nov 07 2022 | Application (22A428) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2022 to January 12, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 16 2022 | Application (22A428) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 28, 2022. | | | Dec 20 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 23, 2023) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 03 2023 | Waiver of right of respondents Steven T. Marshall, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 03 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent City of Satsuma to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 03 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Town of Leesburg, Alabama to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 11 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023. | | | Jan 17 2023 | Response Requested. (Due February 16, 2023) | | | Jan 20 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 08 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2023 to March 2, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 09 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 2, 2023. | | | Feb 16 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 16 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Restore the Fourth, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 01 2023 | Brief of respondents Steven T. Marshall, Attorney General of Alabama, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 15 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/31/2023. | | | Mar 15 2023 | Reply of petitioners Halima Tariffa Culley, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 10 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023. | | | Apr 17 2023 | Petition GRANTED. | | | Apr 27 2023 | Motion of the parties for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. | | Main Document | May 04 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including June 22, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including granted and the time is extended to and including August 14, 2023. | | |
|