Docket for 22-5408
|
May 09 2022 | Application (21A715) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 7, 2022 to August 6, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main Document | May 13 2022 | Application (21A715) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 6, 2022. | | | Aug 01 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 19, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix | Oct 06 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022. | | | Oct 31 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|