Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-448
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-448
Title:Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, et al., Petitioners
v.
Community Financial Services Association of America, Limited, et al.
Docketed:November 14, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-50826)
   Decision Date:October 19, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2022)
Certificate of Word CountPetition
Nov 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2022 to January 13, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 21 2022Response to motion to extend the time to file a response filed.
Main Document
Nov 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 13, 2023.
Dec 14 2022Brief amici curiae of West Virginia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 14 2022Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2023Brief of respondents Community Financial Services Association of America, Limited, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Feb 01 2023Reply of petitioner Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 21 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/24/2023.
Feb 27 2023Petition GRANTED.
Mar 10 2023Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Mar 14 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including May 8, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 3, 2023.
Apr 26 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 08 2023Brief of petitioners Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 12 2023Brief amici curiae of Farm Action, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
May 15 2023Brief amici curiae of States of New York, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2023Brief amici curiae of Community Development Credit Unions and Financial Institutions Including Self-Help Credit Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2023Brief amici curiae of Professors of History and Constitutional Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2023Brief amici curiae of Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 15 2023Brief amici curiae of Military and Veterans Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Treasury Employees Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2023Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2023Brief amici curiae of The Mortgage Bankers Association, et al. in support of neither party.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2023Brief amici curiae of 90 State and Local Nonprofit Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2023Brief amici curiae of AARP and AARP Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2023Brief amici curiae of Ten Consumer Advocacy Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 15 2023Brief amici curiae of Financial Regulation Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2023Brief of respondents Community Financial Services Association of America, Limited, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 06 2023Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2023Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia and 26 Other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Brief amici curiae of Former Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Brief amici curiae of Credit Union National Association, Inc., National Association of Federally-Insured Credit Unions, and American Association of Credit Union Leagues filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Brief amici curiae of ACA International filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Brief amici curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Brief amicus curiae of Third Party Payment Processors Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Brief amici curiae of 132 Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Brief amicus curiae of John Michael “Mick” Mulvaney filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Foundation for Government Accountability filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Brief amici curiae of America's Future, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2023Motion of State of West Virginia and 26 Other States for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 12 2023Response in opposition to motion from respondents Community Financial Services Association of America, Limited, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 14 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 3, 2023.
Jul 17 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit.
Jul 24 2023Record from W.D. Tex. electronically received and available with the Clerk.
Jul 24 2023Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. The record is electronic and available on PACER.
Jul 27 2023CIRCULATED
Aug 02 2023Reply of petitioners Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2023Motion of West Virginia and 26 Other States for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument DENIED.
Oct 03 2023Argued. For petitioners: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Noel J. Francisco, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel John Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

njfrancisco@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Community Financial Services Association of America, Limited, et al.
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
1628 N. Main St. #289
Salinas, CA 93906

ATCASO@CCG1776.COM
916-601-1916
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Julian Richard Ellis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP
675 15th Street, Suite 2900
Denver, CO 80202

jellis@bhfs.com
303-223-1142
Party name: Credit Union National Association, Inc., National Association of Federally-Insured Credit Unions, and American Association of Credit Union Leagues
Matthew Conrad Forys
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Avenue, Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

MATT@LANDMARKLEGAL.ORG
703-554-6100
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Rachel Lauren Fried
    Counsel of Record
Democracy Forward Foundation
P.O. Box 34553
Washington, DC 20043

RFRIED@DEMOCRACYFORWARD.ORG
(202) 448-9090
Party name: Farm Action, HEAL Food Alliance, Institute for Agriculture and Trade Policy, Rural Coalition, Partners for Rural Transformation
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Professors of History and Constitutional Law
Maame Gyamfi
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation
601 E Street NW
Washington, DC 20004

MGYAMFI@AARP.ORG
202-434-6291
Party name: AARP and AARP Foundation
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

HHUNT@DEUTSCHHUNT.COM
2028686915
Party name: Members of Congress
Richard Adam Koffman
    Counsel of Record
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
1100 New York Ave NW Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20005

RKOFFMAN@COHENMILSTEIN.COM
2024084674
Party name: Community Development Credit Unions and Financial Institutions Including Self-Help Credit Union, The Center For Responsible Lending, And National Association of Latino Community Asset Builders
Gregory M. Lipper
    Counsel of Record
LeGrand Law PLLC
1100 H Street NW
Suite 1220
Washington, DC 20005

GLIPPER@LEGRANDPLLC.COM
(202) 996-0919
Party name: Financial Regulation Scholars
Robert Mark Loeb
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

RLOEB@ORRICK.COM
202-339-8475
Party name: The Mortgage Bankers Association, The National Association of Home Builders and The National Association of Realtors
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

JMASSLON@WLF.ORG
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Separation of Powers Clinic, Gray Center
3301 Fairfax Dr.
Arlington, VA 22201

rmccotte@gmu.edu
202-706-5488
Party name: 132 Members of Congress
Seth E. Mermin
    Counsel of Record
UCBerkeley Ctr for Consumer Law & Economic Justice
UC Berkeley School of Law
Suite 308
Berkeley, CA 94720-7200

TMERMIN@LAW.BERKELEY.EDU
(510) 393-8254
Party name: 90 State and Local Nonprofit Organizations
Christopher Owen Murray
    Counsel of Record
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck LLP
675 15th Street
Suite 2900
Denver, CO 80202

cmurray@bhfs.com
303-223-1183
Party name: ACA International
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

SNELSON@CITIZEN.ORG
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen. et al.
Cameron Thomas Norris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd., Ste 700
Arlington, VA 22209

cam@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

WJO@MINDSPRING.COM
7033565070
Party name: America's Future, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP
2001 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

MARK.PERRY@WEIL.COM
(202) 682-7000
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Brunn Wall Roysden III
    Counsel of Record
Fusion Law, PLLC
7600 N. 15th St., Suite 150
Phoenix, AZ 85020

beau@fusion.law
6023157545
Party name: John Michael “Mick” Mulvaney
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rich.samp@ncla.legal
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance, et al.
John Paul Schnapper-Casteras
    Counsel of Record
Schnapper-Casteras PLLC
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

JPSC@SCHNAPPERCASTERAS.COM
(202) 630-3644
Party name: Military and Veterans Organizations
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
State Capitol Complex
Building 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

LINDSAY.S.SEE@WVAGO.GOV
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 26 Other States
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
State Capitol Complex
Building 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 15 Other States
Thomas Samuel Silverstein
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K Street, NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

TSILVERSTEIN@LAWYERSCOMMITTEE.ORG
(202) 662-8600
Party name: Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Housing Clinic of Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization at Yale Law School, Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, National Fair Housing Alliance, Unidosus, et al.
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 West Monroe
Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

MISHA.TSEYTLIN@TROUTMAN.COM
608-999-1240
Party name: Third Party Payment Processors Association
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: States of New York, California, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaiʻi, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, North Carolina, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Washington, and Wisconsin, and the District of Columbia
Helgi C. Walker
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

hwalker@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3692
Party name: Former Members of Congress
Stewart Lee Whitson
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Government Accountability
15275 Collier Blvd
Naples, FL 34119

stewart@thefga.org
239-244-8808
Party name: The Foundation for Government Accountability
Julie Marie Wilson
    Counsel of Record
800 K Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

JULIE.WILSON@NTEU.ORG
202-572-5500
Party name: National Treasury Employees Union

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543