Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-380
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-380
Title:Raland J. Brunson, Petitioner
v.
Alma S. Adams, et al.
Docketed:October 24, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-4007)
   Decision Date:October 6, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 20 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 23, 2022)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 23 2022Waiver of United States of right to respond submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Raland J. Brunson4287 South Harrison Blvd.
Apt. #132
Ogden, UT 84403

(385) 492-4898
Party name: Raland J. Brunson
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543