Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-30
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-30
Title:David Ritter, Petitioner
v.
Linda Migliori, et al.
Docketed:July 11, 2022
Linked with 21A772
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1499)
   Decision Date:May 27, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 27 2022Application (21A772) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 27 2022Response to application (21A772) requested by Justice Alito, due by noon (EDT), Tuesday, May 31st, 2022.
May 30 2022Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Applicant filed by Doctor Oz for Senate and Dr. Mehmet Oz.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
May 31 2022Upon consideration of the application of counsel for the applicant and the responses filed thereto, it is ordered that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, case No. 22-1499, is hereby stayed pending further order of Justice Alito or of the Court.
May 31 2022Response to application from Bonin, Adam C. Zac Cohen filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 31 2022Response to application from respondent Linda Migliori, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 31 2022Letter of respondent Lehigh County Board of Elections filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2022Reply of applicant David Ritter filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Supplemental letter on behalf of respondents filed.
Main Document
Jun 03 2022Supplemental letter of applicant David Ritter filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 09 2022Application (21A772) referred to the Court.
Jun 09 2022The application (21A772) for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is denied. The order heretofore entered by Justice Alito is vacated. Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas and Justice Gorsuch join, dissenting from the denial of the application for stay. (Detached Opinion)
Jul 07 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 10, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 10, 2022 to September 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 6, 2022, for all respondents. See Rule 30.1
Aug 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Honest Elections Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 10 2022Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 10 2022Brief of respondents Lehigh County Board of Elections in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 10 2022Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers Democracy Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 10 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Doctor Oz for Senate and Dr. Mehmet Oz.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 10 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, Bryan Cutler, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2022Brief of respondents Linda Migliori, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2022Brief of respondent Zac Cohen in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under 15.5 filed by petitioners.
Main Document
Sep 09 2022Reply of petitioner David Ritter filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Cameron Thomas Norris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd., Ste 700
Arlington, VA 22209

cam@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: David Ritter
Attorneys for Respondents
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

kbc74@georgetown.edu
202-339-8497
Party name: Zac Cohen
Lucas J. Repka
    Counsel of Record
Lehigh County Department of Law
17 South 7th Street, Room 440
Allentown, PA 18101

lucas@repkamazinlaw.com
(610) 782-3180
Party name: Lehigh County Board of Elections
Ari Joseph Savitzky
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

asavitzky@aclu.org
2125492681
Party name: Linda Migliori, et al.
Adam C. BoninThe Law Office of Adam C Bonin
121 S Broad St, Suite 400
Philadelphia, PA 19107

adam@boninlaw.com
2672425014
Party name: Zac Cohen
Other
H. Christopher Coates
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of H. Christopher Coates
934 Compass Point
Charleston, SC 29412

curriecoates@gmail.com
(843) 609-7080
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc., et al.
John Matthew Gore
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

jmgore@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Doctor Oz for Senate and Dr. Mehmet Oz
Christopher E. Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: Honest Elections Project
Michael James O'Neill
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Ave. Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

mike@landmarklegal.org
703-554-6105
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Richard Bryan Raile
    Counsel of Record
BakerHostetler, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

rraile@bakerlaw.com
202-861-1711
Party name: Lawyers Democracy Fund
Zachary Michael Wallen
    Counsel of Record
Chalmers & Adams LLC
301 South Hills Village Drive, Suite LL200-420
Pittsburgh, PA 15241

zwallen@chalmersadams.com
412-200-0842
Party name: Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, Bryan Cutler, Majority Leader of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, Kerry Benninghoff, President Pro Tempore of the Pennsylvania Senate, Jake Corman, and Majority Leader of the Pennsylvania Senate, Kim Ward

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543