Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-148
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-148
Title:Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc., Petitioner
v.
VIP Products LLC
Docketed:August 17, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-16969)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:May 10, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 05 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 16, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 16, 2022 to October 17, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 17, 2022.
Sep 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Campbell Soup Company filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constellation Brands, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2022Brief amici curiae of American Craft Spirits Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of the International Trademark Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Levi Strauss & Co. and Patagonia Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 17 2022Brief of respondent VIP Products LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2022Reply of petitioner Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/18/2022.
Nov 21 2022Petition GRANTED.
Nov 28 2022Motion of Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc. for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document
Dec 02 2022Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc. submitted.
Blanket Consent

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Bennett Evan Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Dickinson Wright PLLC
1850 N. Central Ave., Ste. 1400
Phoenix, AZ 85004

bcooper@dickinsonwright.com
6022855044
Party name: VIP Products LLC
Other
William G. Barber
    Counsel of Record
Pirkey Barber PLLC
1801 E. 6th Street
Suite 300
Austin, TX 78702

bbarber@pirkeybarber.com
(512) 482-5223
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
H. Christopher Bartolomucci
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

cbartolomucci@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Campbell Soup Company
Edward Tuck Colbert
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20037

ecolbert@huntonak.com
2026623010
Party name: Constellation Brands, Inc
Gregory S. Gilchrist
    Counsel of Record
Verso Law Group LLP
209 Kearny St., 3rd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94108

greg.gilchrist@versolaw.com
415-534-0495
Party name: Levi Strauss & Co. and Patagonia Inc.
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@wsgr.com
(202) 973-8888
Party name: American Craft Spirits Association, American Distilled Spirits Alliance, The Beer Institute, The Brewers Association, Distilled Spirits Council of the United States, and the Wine Institute
Vijay Kumar Toke
    Counsel of Record
Rimon P.C.
423 Washington Street
Suite 600
San Francisco, CA 94111

vijay.toke@rimonlaw.com
415-683-5472
Party name: The International Trademark Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543