Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-138
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-138
Title:Billy Raymond Counterman, Petitioner
v.
Colorado
Docketed:August 11, 2022
Linked with 21A873
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(17CA1465)
   Decision Date:July 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 11, 2022
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 27 2022Application (21A873) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 10, 2022 to September 8, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 29 2022Application (21A873) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until August 9, 2022.
Aug 09 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 12, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 12, 2022 to October 12, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 12, 2022.
Sep 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2022Brief of respondent Colorado in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2022Reply of petitioner Billy Raymond Counterman filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/18/2022.
Nov 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/2/2022.
Dec 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.
Jan 03 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 09 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/13/2023.
Jan 13 2023Petition GRANTED.
Jan 31 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 19, 2023.
Feb 08 2023Record requested from the Court of Appeals of Colorado.
Feb 21 2023Register of actions and briefs received from Court of Appeals of Colorado. Record request also transmitted to trial court.
Feb 22 2023Brief of petitioner Billy Raymond Counterman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2023Joint appendix (3 volumes) filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Feb 28 2023Electronic record transmitted from Arapahoe Combined Court (Colorado).
Feb 28 2023Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2023Brief amici curiae of Southwestern law student Elena Cordonean, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2023Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2023Amicus brief of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. In Support of Petitioner. not accepted for filing (Corrected version to be submitted--March 03, 2023).
Mar 01 2023Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed (Mar. 8, 2023).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of Human Rights for Kids filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2023Brief amicus curiae of Jack Jordan in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2023Brief amicus curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2023CIRCULATED
Mar 24 2023Brief of respondent Colorado filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2023Amicus brief of Legal Momentum et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2023Amicus brief of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Billy Raymond Counterman
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric Reuel Olson
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

eric.olson@coag.gov
7205086548
Party name: Colorado
Other
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom
Michael Meredith Epstein
    Counsel of Record
Amicus Project at Southwestern Law School
3050 Wilshire Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90010

amicusproject@swlaw.edu
213-738-6774
Party name: Elena Cordonean, Norman Garland and Michael M. Epstein
Jack Revels Tucker Jordan
    Counsel of Record
Jack Jordan
3102 Howell Street
North Kansas City, MO 64116

jack.jordan@emobilawyer.com
816-853-1142
Party name: Jack Jordan
Jeffrey A. Mandell
    Counsel of Record
Stafford Rosenbaum, LLP
222 West Washington Avenue
Suite 900
Madison, WI 53703

JMANDELL@STAFFORDLAW.COM
608-210-6303
Party name: Dean Erwin Chemerinsky, Professor Danielle Citron, Professor Michael C. Dorf, Professor Mary Anne Franks, Professor Eric J. Segall, Professor Cristina Tilley
Kymberlee Claire Stapleton
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

KYM.STAPLETON@CJLF.ORG
916-446-0345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
Mary-Christine Sungaila
    Counsel of Record
Complex Appellate Litigation Group LLP
620 Newport Center Drive
Suite 1100
Newport Beach, CA 92660

mc.sungaila@calg.com
(949) 991 1900
Party name: Legal Momentum et al.
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of Press
1156 15th Street NW
Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bruce.brown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
John Howard Fleming
    Counsel of Record
Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP
999 Peachtree Street, NE
Suite 2300
Atlanta, GA 30309-3996

johnfleming@eversheds-sutherland.com
(404) 853-8000
Party name: Human Rights for Kids
David Allen Greene
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109-7701

DAVIDG@EFF.ORG
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation and Student Press Law Center
Brian M. Hauss
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

BHAUSS@ACLU.ORG
2125492604
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado, Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression, National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, and National Coalition Against Censorship In Support of Petitioner.
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
Darpana M. Sheth
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
510 Walnut Street
Suite 1250
Philadelphia, PA 19106

DARPANA.SHETH@THEFIRE.ORG
2157173473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
John W. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
The Rutherford Institute
109 Deerwood Road
Charlottesville, VA 22911

legal@rutherford.org
4349783888
Party name: The Rutherford Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543