Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-825
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-825
Title:Persephone Johnson Shon, Petitioner
v.
Bogdan Radu
Docketed:December 3, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-17022)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 3, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2021Motion to Schedule Parallel Oral Argument and Briefing with Golan v. Saada or, in the Alternative, to Defer Consideration of Petition Until Conclusion of Golan v. Saada received.
Main Document
Dec 31 2021Letter of December 31, 2021, with supplemental appendix filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 03 2022Waiver of right of respondent Bogdan Radu to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 06 2022Response to motion received.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 11 2022Response Requested. (Due February 10, 2022)
Jan 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 10, 2022 to March 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 24 2022Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioner filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including February 25, 2022.
Jan 26 2022Letter from counsel for petitioner dated January 24, 2022 received.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 25 2022Brief of respondent Bogdan Radu in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 27 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Golan v. Saada, 596 U. S. ___ (2022).
Jul 29 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen J. Cullen
    Counsel of Record
Miles & Stockbridge P.C.
1201 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20004

scullen@milesstockbridge.com
202-465-8374
Party name: Persephone Johnson Shon
Attorneys for Respondent
Michelle Erica Irwin
    Counsel of Record
Fenwick & West LLP
1191 Second Ave, Floor 10
Seattle, WA 98101

mirwin@fenwick.com
206-913-4312
Party name: Bogdan Radu
Todd Richard GregorianFenwick & West LLP
555 California Street, 12th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

tgregorian@fenwick.com
4158752300
Party name: Bogdan Radu

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543