Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-806
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-806
Title:Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County, et al., Petitioners
v.
Ivanka Talevski, Personal Representative of the Estate of Gorgi Talevski, Deceased
Docketed:December 1, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1664)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 25, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 3, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Waiver of right of respondent Gorgi Talevski, by his next friend Ivanka Talevski to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 03 2022Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2022Brief amici curiae of American Health Care Association and Indiana Health Care Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022Response Requested. (Due February 9, 2022)
Jan 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 9, 2022 to March 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2022.
Mar 01 2022Motion under Rule 35.1 filed to substitute Ivanka Talevski, as authorized representative, as respondent in place of Gorgi Talevski, deceased.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 11 2022Brief of respondent Gorgi Talevski, by his next friend Ivanka Talevski in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2022Reply of petitioners Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 12 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 02 2022Motion to substitute Ivanka Talevski, as authorized representative, as respondent in place of Gorgi Talevski, deceased GRANTED.
May 02 2022Petition GRANTED.
May 05 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Ivanka Talevski, Authorized Representative of Gorgi Talevski, Deceased
Blanket Consent
May 05 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 06 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County, et al.
Blanket Consent
May 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 18, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 16, 2022.
Jul 18 2022Brief of petitioners Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 25 2022Amicus brief of National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. not accepted for filing. (Corrected version to be submitted - July 26, 2022)
Jul 25 2022Brief amici curiae of National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al.filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2022Brief amici curiae of American Health Care Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of Robert M. Kerr, Director of South Carolina Department of Health & Human Services filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, November 8, 2022.
Aug 31 2022CIRCULATED
Sep 09 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 09 2022Motion of Indiana, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 12 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit.
Sep 12 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Sep 16 2022Brief of respondent Ivanka Talevski, Personal Representative of the Estate of Gorgi Talevski, Deceased filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Pennsylvania Association for Justice, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2022Brief amici curiae of The American Public Health Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amicus curiae of California Medical Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 23 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Indiana Trial Lawyers Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Statutory interpretation Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Indiana Disability Rights filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Children’s Health Care Providers and Advocates filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amicus curiae of Toby S. Edelman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of National Center for Youth Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Senior Officials of The Department of Health and Human Services filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of The National Health Law Program, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amicus curiae of Daniel L. Hatcher filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Georgia Advocacy Office, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of National Association of Community Health Centers, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of AARP, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Retired Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 23 2022Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Contract Law and Legal History Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Health Policy Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 11 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Oct 11 2022Motion of Indiana, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 17 2022Reply of petitioners Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2022Argued. For petitioners: Lawrence S. Robbins, New York, N. Y.; and Thomas M. Fisher, Solicitor General, Indianapolis, Ind. (for Indiana, et al., as amici curiae.) For United States, as amicus curiae: Benjamin W. Snyder, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Andrew T. Tutt, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lawrence Saul Robbins
    Counsel of Record
Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP
7 Times Square
28th Floor
New York, NY 10036-6516

lrobbins@fklaw.com
212-833-1118
Party name: Health and Hospital Corporation of Marion County, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: Ivanka Talevski, Personal Representative of the Estate of Gorgi Talevski, Deceased
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IBhabha@jenner.com
202-637-6327
Party name: Former Senior Officials of The Department of Health and Human Services
Carolyn Frances Corwin
    Counsel of Record
Covington and Burling LLP
One City Center
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

ccorwin@cov.com
(202) 662-5338
Party name: Health Policy Scholars
Thomas W. Curvin
    Counsel of Record
Eversheds Sutherland (US), LLP
999 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2300
Atlanta, GA 30309

tomcurvin@eversheds-sutherland.com
4048538314
Party name: American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network et al.
Robert F. Daley
    Counsel of Record
Robert Peirce and Associates, P.C.
2500 Gulf Tower
707 Grant Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15219

bdaley@peircelaw.com
4122817229
Party name: Pennsylvania Association for Justice
Matthew James Dowd
    Counsel of Record
Dowd Scheffel PLLC
1717 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 1025
Washington, DC 20006

mdowd@dowdscheffel.com
202-559-9175
Party name: Former Members of Congress
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington St.
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Indiana, et al.
Karla Ann Gilbride
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice
1620 L St. NW, Ste. 630
Washington, DC 20036

kgilbride@publicjustice.net
2027978600
Party name: scholars of statutory stare decisis, statutory interpretation, and jurisprudence
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, and ACLU of Indiana
Maame Gyamfi
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation
601 E Street NW
Washington, DC 20049

mgyamfi@aarp.org
202-434-6291
Party name: AARP, et al.
Ashley Nicole Hadler
    Counsel of Record
Garau Germano, P.C.
3710 Washington Blvd
lndianapolis, IN 46205

ahadler@g-glawfirm.com
317-285-0150
Party name: The Indiana Trial Lawyers Association
Theodore Augustus Howard
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

thoward@wiley.law
(202) 719-7120
Party name: Toby S. Edelman
Paul Robert Koster
    Counsel of Record
Emory Law School Supreme Court Advocacy Program
1301 Clifton Road
Atlanta, GA 30322

paul.koster@emory.edu
4047273957
Party name: Georgia Advocacy Office and the Emory Law School Disabled Law Students Association
Stacey Monica Leyton
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

sleyton@altber.com
4154217151
Party name: California Medical Association
Wendy Liu
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

wliu@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Brian Andrew Morris
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Rd., Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

bmorris@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Emily Anne Munson
    Counsel of Record
Indiana Disability Rights
4755 Kingsway Drive, Suite 100
Indianapolis, IN 46205

emunson1@indianadisabilityrights.org
317-504-2578
Party name: Indiana Disability Rights
Aaron M. Panner
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

apanner@kellogghansen.com
2023267921
Party name: Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, et al.
William John Rold
    Counsel of Record
98 Bergen St.
Brooklyn, NY 11201

williamjroldesq@verizon.net
17186242890
Party name: Retired Lawyers
Christopher Paul Schandevel
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

cschandevel@ADFlegal.org
5717074655
Party name: Robert M. Kerr, Director of South Carolina Department of Health & Human Services
James F. Segroves
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
1301 K Street, N.W.
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005-3373

jsegroves@reedsmith.com
2024149294
Party name: American Health Care Association and Indiana Health Care Association
Benjamin Gross Shatz
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps, & Phillips, LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 1700
Los Angles, CA 90067-3119

bshatz@manatt.com
3103124383
Party name: Children’s Health Care Providers and Advocates
Thomas Gregory Sprankling
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2600 El Camino Real, Suite 400
Palo Alto, CA 94306

Thomas.Sprankling@wilmerhale.com
650-858-6062
Party name: Contract Law and Legal History Professors
Anjali Srinivasan
    Counsel of Record
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

asrinivasan@keker.com
415-391-5400
Party name: Members of Congress
Constance Grace Van Kley
    Counsel of Record
Upper Seven Law
1 N Last Chance Gulch
Helena, MT 59601

cvk@uppersevenlaw.com
406-306-0330
Party name: National Center for Youth Law, Youth Law Center, National Center for Law & Economic Justice, et al.
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: The National Health Law Program (NHeLP)
Robert John Ward
    Counsel of Record
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

Robert.Ward@srz.com
2127562000
Party name: Daniel L. Hatcher
Edward Todd Waters
    Counsel of Record
Feldesman Tucker Leifer Fidell LLP
1129 20th Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

ewaters@ftlf.com
2024668960
Party name: National Association of Community Health Centers and Thirty-One Primary Care Associations
Stephanie A. Webster
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

stephanie.webster@ropesgray.com
202-508-4859
Party name: The American Public Health Association, The American College of Preventive Medicine, et al.
Christopher J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
HWG LLP
1919 M Street NW, Fl. 8
Washington, DC 20036

cwright@hwglaw.com
202-730-1325
Party name: National Conference of State Legislatures, Council of State Governments, National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, United States Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, International Municipal Lawyers Association, and Government Finance Officers Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543