Dec 10 2021 | Application (21A223) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 26, 2021 to February 24, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Dec 15 2021 | Application (21A223) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 24, 2022. |
| |
Feb 24 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 31, 2022) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service |
Mar 29 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 31, 2022 to May 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 30 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2022. |
| |
Apr 18 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 2, 2022 to June 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Apr 19 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 1, 2022. |
| |
May 19 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2022 to July 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
May 20 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 1, 2022. |
| |
Jun 24 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2022 to August 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jun 27 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 1, 2022. |
| |
Jul 15 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 1, 2022 to August 31, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jul 18 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 31, 2022. |
| |
Aug 31 2022 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count |
Sep 14 2022 | Reply of petitioner Dylann Storm Roof filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Sep 15 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022. |
| |
Oct 11 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
| |