Docket for 21-7205
|
Jan 06 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 28, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Mar 04 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 10 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022. | | | Mar 28 2022 | The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until April 18, 2022, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court. | | | Apr 13 2022 | Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 20 2022 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022. | | | May 16 2022 | Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner DENIED. | | | Jul 14 2022 | Case considered closed. | | |
|