Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-707
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-707
Title:Students for Fair Admissions, Inc., Petitioner
v.
University of North Carolina, et al.
Docketed:November 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2263)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due December 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 11 2021Motion to expedite briefing of the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed by petitioner Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.
Main Document
Nov 18 2021Motion of The University of North Carolina et al. to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2021 to January 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 18 2021Response to motion to expedite from respondent The University of North Carolina et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 19 2021Motion of Cecilia Polanco, et al. to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2021 to January 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2021Response to motion to expedite from respondent Cecilia Polanco, et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 19 2021Reply in Support of Motion to Expedite and Opposition to Motions for an Extension filed.
Main Document
Nov 22 2021The motion of The University of North Carolina, et al. to extend the time to file a response is granted in part, and the time is extended to and including December 20, 2021.
Nov 22 2021The motion of Cecilia Polanco, et al. to extend the time to file a response is granted in part, and the time is extended to and including December 20, 2021.
Dec 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Californians for Equal Rights Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor David Bernstein filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 14 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Federal Officials of the Department of Education's Office for Civil Rights filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 14 2021Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Asian American Coalition for Education and the Asian American Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Speech First and Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2021Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 20 2021Brief of respondents Cecilia Polanco, et al. in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2021Brief of respondents University respondents in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 23 2021Reply of petitioner Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 24 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-1199 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 24 2022Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-1199. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-1199. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jul 22 2022This case is no longer consolidated with No. 20-1199, Students for Fair Admissions v. President and Fellows of Harvard, and one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Jul 25 2022Brief of University Respondents filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2022Brief of Respondent-Students Cecilia Polanco, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2022Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. & National Association for the Advancement of Colored People filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2022Amicus brief of Human Rights Advocates, et al. not accepted for filing. (August 31, 2022--Corrected brief and PDF submitted.)
Jul 27 2022Brief amici curiae of Human Rights Advocates, et al. filed. VIDED. (Aug. 3, 2022)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2022Brief amici curiae of Association of American Medical Colleges, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2022Brief amici curiae of 25 Diverse, California-Focused Bar Associations, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Council of the Great City Schools filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor F. Andrew Hessick filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of HR Policy Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of National Asian Pacific American Bar Association, et al. and National LGBTQ+ Bar Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of The American Bar Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of 1,246 American Social Science Researchers and Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of The American Psychological Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of National School Boards Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of American Educational Research Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Admissions and Testing Professionals filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Amicus brief of Admissions and Testing Professionals not accepted for filing. (Duplicate submission--August 31, 2022.)
Aug 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Black Law Students Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Asian Americans Advancing Justice, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center and 37 Additional Organizations Committed to Race and Gender Equality filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity and Fund for Leadership, Equity, Access and Diversity filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of HBCU Leaders and National Association for Equal Opportunity in Higher Education filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts Institute of Technology, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of American G.I. Forum, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Academy of Education filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Georgetown University, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Deborah Cohen and 67 Other Professors filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of College Board, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of United States Senators and Former Senators filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of President and Chancellors of the University of California filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Multicultural Media, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Law Firm Antiracism Alliance filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Amherst, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Motion of United States for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Motion for divided argument and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed by student respondents.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Teachers filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Washington Bar Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Major American Business Enterprises filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Robert C. "Bobby" Scott, Member of Congress, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Southern Governors filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of National Association of Basketball Coaches, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of American Council on Education and 39 Other Higher Education Associations filed. VIDED. (Aug. 8, 2022 - To be reprinted and new PDF resubmitted.)
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of American Council on Education and 39 Other Higher Education Associations filed. VIDED. (Aug. 8, 2022)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Deans of U.S. Law Schools filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of The University of Michigan filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars Defending Race-Conscious Admissions filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Brown University, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Applied Materials, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors of History and Law filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Adm. Charles S. Abbot, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Black Women Law Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Individual Scientists filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Faith Organizations, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Aug 01 2022Amicus brief of National Education Association et al. not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted - Aug. 10, 2022.)
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of National Education Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Empirical Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Amicus brief of Youth Advocates and Experts on Educational Access not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted - Aug. 16, 2022.)
Aug 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Youth Advocates and Experts on Educational Access filed. VIDED. (Aug. 11, 2022)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, October 31, 2022.
Aug 24 2022Reply of petitioner Students for Fair Admissions, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2022CIRCULATED
Sep 09 2022Motion for divided argument and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed by student respondents GRANTED.
Sep 09 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED, and the time is divided as follows: 45 minutes for petitioner, 20 minutes for the university respondents, 10 minutes for the student respondents, and 15 minutes for the Solicitor General.
Sep 12 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Sep 15 2022Record received from the U.S.D.C. Middle Dist. of North Carolina has been electronically filed.
Oct 31 2022Argued. For petitioner: Patrick Strawbridge, Boston, Mass. For university respondents: Ryan Y. Park, Solicitor General, Raleigh, N. C. For student respondents: David G. Hinojosa, Washington, D. C. For United States, as amicus curiae, supporting respondents: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.
William Spencer ConsovoyConsovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.
Patrick StrawbridgeConsovoy McCarthy PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
617-227-0548
Party name: Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
David G. Hinojosa
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K. St. NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

dhinojosa@lawyerscommittee.org
2026628307
Party name: Cecilia Polanco, et al.
Ryan Young Park
    Counsel of Record
North Carolina Department of Justice - Office of the Solicitor General
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

rpark@ncdoj.gov
9197166400
Party name: The University of North Carolina et al.
Other
Daniel Dennis Doyle
    Counsel of Record
Lashly & Baer, P.C.
714 Locust Street
St. Louis, MO 63101

ddoyle@lashlybaer.com
314-621-2939
Party name: Accept, Inc.
Daniel Dennis Doyle
    Counsel of Record
Lashly & Baer, P.C.
714 Locust Street
St. Louis, MO 63101

ddoyle@lashlybaer.com
314-621-2939
Party name: Association of College Counselors in Independent Schools, Inc.
Daniel Dennis Doyle
    Counsel of Record
Lashly & Baer, P.C.
714 Locust Street
St. Louis, MO 63101

ddoyle@lashlybaer.com
314-621-2939
Party name: Admissions and Testing Professionals
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Angelo N. Ancheta
    Counsel of Record
53 Delano Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94112

angelo@ancheta.law
415-672-0737
Party name: American Educational Research Association, et al.
Ginger D. Anders
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

ginger.anders@mto.com
2022201107
Party name: President and Chancellors of the University of California
Deborah N. Archer
    Counsel of Record
NYU School of Law
245 Sullivan Street
Room 610
New York, NY 10012

deborah.archer@nyu.edu
2129986882
Party name: National Black Law Students Association
Bradley Alan Benbrook
    Counsel of Record
Benbrook Law Group
400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530
Sacramento, CA 95814

brad@benbrooklawgroup.com
9164474900
Party name: Speech First and Southeastern Legal Foundation
Brigida Benitez
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1330 Connecticut Ave., N. W.
Washington, DC 20036

bbenitez@steptoe.com
202-429-3000
Party name: Robert C. "Bobby" Scott, Member of Congress and 64 Other Members of Congress
Upnit K. Bhatti
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

ubhatti@orrick.com
(202) 339-8400
Party name: Washington Bar Association and Women's Bar Association of the District of Columbia
John W. Borkowski
    Counsel of Record
Husch Blackwell
120 South Riverside Plaza, Suite 2200
Chicago, IL 60606

john.borkowski@huschblackwell.com
312-526-1538
Party name: The Council of the Great City Schools
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
Daniel H. Bromberg
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
Four Embarcadero Center
22nd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

dan.bromberg@pillsburylaw.com
(415) 983-1000
Party name: National Asian Pacific American Bar Association and National LGBTQ+ Bar Association
Michael Alan Brown
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP
100 S. Charles Street
Suite 1600
Baltimore, MD 21201

mike.brown@nelsonmullins.com
(443) 392-9401
Party name: College Board, National Association for College Admission Counseling, American Association of Collegiate Registrars and Admissions Officers, and ACT, Inc.
Mark Simon Davies
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
Columbia Center
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mark.davies@orrick.com
202-339-8631
Party name: Applied Materials, Inc., Corteva Agriscience, Cummins Inc., DuPont de Nemours, Inc., Gilead Sciences, Inc., LinkedIn Corp., Mastercard Inc., Micron Technology, Inc., Microsoft Corp., Shell USA, Inc., and Verizon Services Corp.
Constance de la Vega
    Counsel of Record
University of San Francisco School of Law
2130 Fulton Street
San Francisco, CA 94117

delavega@usfca.edu
415-422-2296
Party name: Human Rights Advocates and Human Rights First
Kelly M. Dermody
    Counsel of Record
Lieff Cabraser Heimann and Bernstein, LLP
275 Battery Street
29th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

kdermody@lchb.com
(415) 956-1000
Party name: Youth Advocates and Experts on Educational Access
Elizabeth Napier Dewar
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

bessie.dewar@mass.gov
617-963-2204
Party name: Massachusetts et al.
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: Major American Business Enterprises
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: American Council on Education and 39 Other Higher Education Associations
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: The University of Michigan
Wencong Fa
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

wfa@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Center for Equal Opportunity, Reason Foundation, Chinese American Citizens Alliance - Greater New York, Yi Fang Chen, Coalition for TJ, and Project 21
Gordon M. Fauth Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Litigation Law Group
1935 Addison St., Ste. A
Berkeley, CA 94704

gmf@classlitigation.com
5102389610
Party name: Asian American Coalition for Education and the Asian American Legal Foundation
Jonathan Saul Franklin
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
799 9th Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com
2026620466
Party name: Association of American Medical Colleges et al.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: United States Senators and Representatives
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: Massachusetts Institute of Technology, et al.
Vinay Vasdev Harpalani
    Counsel of Record
University of New Mexico School of Law
1117 Stanford Drive NE
Albuquerque, NM 87131

vinayh@unm.edu
215-873-4476
Party name: Legal Scholars Defending Race-Conscious Admissions
Mark David Harris
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

mharris@proskauer.com
212-969-3530
Party name: Amherst, Barnard, Bates, Bowdoin, Bryn Mawr, Carleton, Colby, Connecticut, Davidson, Franklin & Marshall, Hamilton, Hampshire, Haverford, Macalester, Middlebury, Mount Holyoke, Oberlin, Pomona, Reed, Sarah Lawrence, Smith, St. Olaf, Swarthmore, Trinity, Union, Vassar, Wellesley, and Williams Colleges, and Bucknell, Clark, Tufts, Washington & Lee, and Wesleyan Universities
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
20th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

khartnett@cooley.com
(415) 693-2000
Party name: Professors of History and Law
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Brown University, et al.
Sarah Ann Hinger
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad St.
New York, NY 10004

shinger@aclu.org
2125197882
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union et al.
Ashley Lee Hogewood III
    Counsel of Record
K&L Gates LLP
4350 Lassiter at North Hills Avenue Suite 300
Raleigh, NC 27609

lee.hogewood@klgates.com
(919) 743-7306
Party name: Individual Scientists
Corrine Anetra Irish
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
2550 M St, NW
Washington, DC 20037

corrine.irish@squirepb.com
2024576346
Party name: Faith Organizations including The General Synod - United Church of Christ, American Baptist Home Mission Societies & African Descent Lutheran Association of the ELCA
William Alan Jacobson
    Counsel of Record
18 Maple Ave #280
Barrington, RI 02806

contact@legalinsurrection.com
4012464192
Party name: Legal Insurrection Foundation
George Roger King
    Counsel of Record
G Roger King
1001 19th St., North
Suite 1002
Arlington, VA 22209

rking@hrpolicy.org
6145823939
Party name: HR Policy Association
Yelena Konanova
    Counsel of Record
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

lkonanova@selendygay.com
(212) 390-9000
Party name: National Academy of Education
Cory Ren Liu
    Counsel of Record
Ashcroft Law Firm LLC
919 Congress, Ste 1325
Austin, TX 78701

cliu@ashcroftlawfirm.com
512-370-1800
Party name: Professor David Bernstein
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
202-662-5612
Party name: United States Senators and Former Senators
Laurel Pyke Malson
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20004

lmalson@crowell.com
2026242500
Party name: HBCU Leaders and National Association for Equal Opportunity in Higher Education
Susan Leann Baker Manning
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

susan.manning@morganlewis.com
202-739-6000
Party name: Empirical Scholars
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
Stephen Robert McAllister
    Counsel of Record
Dentons US LLP
4520 Main Street
Suite 1100
Kansas City, MO 64111-7700

stephen.mcallister@dentons.com
7855505180
Party name: Law Firm Antiracism Alliance
Charles Luther McCloud
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue, S.W.
Washington, DC 20024

lmccloud@wc.com
202-434-5586
Party name: Southern Governors
Daniel Isaac Morenoff
    Counsel of Record
The Equal Voting Rights Institute d/b/a The American Civil Rights Projects
P.O. Box 12207
Dallas, TX 75225

dan@americancivilrightsproject.org
(214) 504-1835
Party name: Californians for Equal Rights Foundation
Emily Kanstroom Musgrave
    Counsel of Record
Mintz,Levin,Cohn,Ferris,GlovskyandPopeo,P.C.
One Financial Center
Boston, MA 02111

EKMusgrave@mintz.com
6173484407
Party name: Multicultural Media, Telecom and Internet Council, Inc., National Association of Black Owned Broadcasters, National Hispanic Foundation for The Arts, Emma Bowen Foundation for Minority Interests In Media, and National Newspaper Publishers Association
Janai S. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
NAACP LDF, Inc.
40 Rector Street
5th Floor
NEW YORK, NY 10006

jnelson@naacpldf.org
(212) 965-2200
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. & National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
Crystal Nix-Hines
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
865 S. Figueroa Street
10th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

crystalnixhines@quinnemanuel.com
(213) 443-3000
Party name: Georgetown University, et al.
T. Russell Nobile
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
P.O. Box 6592
Gulfport, Mississippi, MS 39506

rnobile@judicialwatch.org
202-527-9866
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation (“AEF”)
Alice Margaret O'Brien
    Counsel of Record
National Education Association
1201 16th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

aobrien@nea.org
202 822 7035
Party name: National Education Association et al.
David Benjamin Oppenheimer
    Counsel of Record
Berkeley Law
Clinical Professor of Law
498 Simon Hall
Berkeley, CA 94720

doppenheimer@law.berkeley.edu
(510) 326-3865
Party name: Deans of U.S. Law Schools
Mark Alexander Packman
    Counsel of Record
Gilbert LLP
700 Pennsylvania Avenue, SE
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20003

packmanm@gilbertlegal.com
202-772-2320
Party name: Deborah Cohen and 67 Other Professors
Neil Anthony Friedman Popovic
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
Four Embarcadero Center
17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

npopovic@sheppardmullin.com
415.434.9100
Party name: Human Rights Advocates, et al.
Michael M. Purpura
    Counsel of Record
Hueston Hennigan LLP
620 Newport Center Dr.
Suite 1300
Newport Beach, CA 92660

mpurpura@hueston.com
949-432-6906
Party name: Adm. Charles S. Abbot, Adm. Dennis C. Blair, Gen. Charles F. Bolden, Jr., Gen. Thomas P. Bostick, Gen. Vincent K. Brooks, Adm. Walter E. Carter, Jr., et al.
Caroline Elizabeth Reynolds
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder, LLP
1800 M Street. NW
Washington, DC 20036

creynolds@zuckerman.com
202-778-1800
Party name: 1,246 American Social Science Researchers and Scholars
Dean Richlin
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag LLP
155 Seaport Blvd.
Boston, MA 02210

drichlin@foleyhoag.com
617-832-1140
Party name: Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund
Elizabeth Ann Ritvo
    Counsel of Record
Brown, Rudnick LLP
One Financial Center
Boston, MA 02111

eritvo@brownrudnick.com
617-856-8249
Party name: American G.I. Forum, et al.
Roberto Andres Rivera-Soto
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
700 East Gate Drive
Suite 330
Cherry Hill, NJ 08054

riverasotor@ballardspahr.com
(856) 761-3416
Party name: Asian Americans Advancing Justice and 37 Organizations
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: American Federation of Teachers
Dennis J. Saffran
    Counsel of Record
Dennis Saffran, Attorney at Law
38-18 West Drive
Douglaston, NY 11363

djsaffranlaw@gmail.com
718-428-7156
Party name: National Association of Scholars
Jaime Ann Santos
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N St. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jsantos@goodwinlaw.com
2023464034
Party name: National Association of Basketball Coaches, et al.
Marilynn Louise Schuyler
    Counsel of Record
Fisher & Phillips LLP
1 Montgomery Street
Suite 3400
San Franscisco, CA 94104

schuyler@schuyleraap.com
4159267642
Party name: American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity and Fund for Leadership, Equity, Access and Diversity
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: National School Boards Association, National Association of Elementary School Principals, American Association of School Administrators, and American School Counselors Association
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: The American Psychological Association, The Massachusetts Psychological Association, and The North Carolina Psychological Association
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
160 Ridge Road
Chapel Hill, NC 27599

RASUNC@GMAIL.COM
(202) 374-4634
Party name: F. Andrew Hessick
Richard Craig Smith
    Counsel of Record
Linklaters LLP
601 13th Street NW, Suite 400 South
Washington, DC 20005

richard.smith@linklaters.com
202-654-9265
Party name: National Women's Law Center and 37 Additional Organizations Committed to Race and Gender Equality
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells Street
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Raymond Patrick Tolentino
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
1050 K Street NW, Suite 1040
Washington, DC 20001

rtolentino@kaplanhecker.com
(212) 763-0883
Party name: Black Women Law Scholars
William E. Trachman
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

wtrachman@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: Former Federal Officials of the Department of Education's Office for Civil Rights
Reginald M. Turner Jr.
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 North Clark Street
Chicao, IL 60654

abapresident@americanbar.org
(312) 988-5000
Party name: The American Bar Association
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
2300 N Street, NW
Suite 643A
Washington, DC 20037

emwenger@HoltzmanVogel.com
2027378808
Party name: Former Attorney General Edwin Meese III
Mark Remy Yohalem
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
633 West Fifth Street
Suite 1550
Los Angeles, CA 90071

mark.yohalem@wsgr.com
323-210-2958
Party name: 25 Diverse, California-Focused Bar Associations, Lawyers Associations, Civil Rights Organizations, and Community Foundations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543