Docket for 21-629
|
Oct 25 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 03 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2021 to December 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 04 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 29, 2021, for all respondents. | | | Nov 12 2021 | Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, United States | | Blanket Consent | Nov 17 2021 | Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, City of Santa Fe, New Mexico | | Blanket Consent | Nov 22 2021 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, et al. | | Blanket Consent | Nov 23 2021 | Brief amici curiae of 289 Organizations and 34 Individuals filed. | | Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 13 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Hector Balderas, Attorney General of New Mexico to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 16 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 29, 2021 to January 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 17 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 28, 2022. | | | Jan 28 2022 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 28 2022 | Brief of respondent City of Santa Fe, New Mexico in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 10 2022 | Reply of petitioners Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 16 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022. | | | Mar 07 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|