SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-5800 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-5800 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Idaho
Docketed:
September 28, 2021
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Idaho
Case Numbers:
(47709)
Decision Date:
February 3, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
April 29, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 23 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 28, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Oct 28 2021
Brief of respondent Idaho in opposition filed.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Nov 10 2021
Reply of petitioner Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr. filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 17 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 06 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonah Joshua Horwitz
Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Services of ldaho
702 W. ldaho St. Ste. 900
Boise, ID 83702
Jonah_Horwitz@fd.org
208 331 5530
Party name: Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
L. LaMont Anderson
Counsel of Record
Idaho Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720-0010
lamont.anderson@ag.idaho.gov
208-334-4542
Party name: Idaho
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##