Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-476
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-476
Title:303 Creative LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Aubrey Elenis, et al.
Docketed:September 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1413)
   Decision Date:July 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2021 to December 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including December 8, 2021.
Oct 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Institute for Faith and Family and Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 27 2021Brief amici curiae of the Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2021Brief amici curiae of Tyndale House Publishers et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2021Brief amici curiae of United States Senators and Representatives filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Public Trust Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2021Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2021Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Scholars et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2021Brief amici curiae of Law and Economics Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2021Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Brief amici curiae of National Religious Broadcasters, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondents Aubrey Elenis, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 22 2021Reply of petitioners 303 Creative LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Feb 04 2022Supplemental brief of respondents Aubrey Elenis, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2022Supplemental brief of petitioners 303 Creative LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether applying a public-accommodation law to compel an artist to speak or stay silent violates the Free Speech Clause of the First Amendment.
Mar 04 2022Motion of the parties for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Mar 10 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, 303 Creative LLC, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 22 2022Motion of the parties to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted in part. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including May 26, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 12, 2022.
Apr 11 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Aubrey Elenis, et al.
Blanket Consent
May 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institue's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2022Brief of petitioners 303 Creative LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2022Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 27 2022Brief amici curiae of Colorado State Legislators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Freedom and Justice Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
May 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Website and Graphic Designers in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Alabama Center for Law and Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2022Brief amici curiae of National Association of Evangelicals, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Faith and Family filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2022Brief amicus curiae of Concerned Women for America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2022Brief amici curiae of Prof. Dale Carpenter, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society and Free Speech Advocates filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Legal Scholar Adam J. Macleod filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Brief amici curiae of C12 Group, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Counsel filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Mark Janus, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Lonang Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Tyndale House Publishers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Amicus brief of First Amendment Scholars not accepted for filing. (June 03, 2022-- incorrect electronic submission, to be resubmitted.)
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of The First Amendment Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for Religious Expression filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Life Legal Defense Foundation and Bioethics Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Young America's Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Walk for Life West Coast, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Family and Sexuality filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of 15 Family Policy Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of United States Senators and Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Christopher R. Green filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Council for Christian Colleges and Universities, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Multimedia Production Professionals filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Law and Economics Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Robert P. George filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Aaron and Melissa Klein filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Kent Greenfield in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Arizona, Nebraska, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Catholic League for Religious and Civil Rights filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Family Research Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Christian Family Coalition (CFC) Florida, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Association of Certified Biblical Counselors Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Creative Professionals and George and Maxine Maynard in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Ethics and Public Policy Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 11 2022Letter pursuant to Rule 35.3 filed.
Main Document
Aug 12 2022Brief of respondents Aubrey Elenis, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2022Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of New York State Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2022Brief amici curiae of The Freedom From Religion Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 18 2022Brief amici curiae of The Western Jurisdiction of the United Methodist Church, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Local Governments and Mayors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Amicus brief of 30 Religious, Civil Rights, and Grassroots Organizations not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief and PDF submitted.)
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of 30 Religious, Civil Rights, and Grassroots Organizations filed. (Aug. 26, 2022)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Amicus brief of Ilan H. Meyer, PhD and Other Social Scientists and Legal Scholars not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief and PDF submitted.)
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Ilan H. Meyer, PhD and Other Social Scientists and Legal Scholars filed. (Aug. 26, 2022)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Amicus brief of Former U.S. Representative Anthony (“Tony”) Coelho, et al. not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief and PDF submitted.)
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Former U.S. Representative Anthony (“Tony”) Coelho, et al. filed. (Aug. 30, 2022)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Public Accommodations Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Modern Military Association of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Scholars (Six) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Scholars (Eight) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Tobias Barrington Wolff filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Behavioral Science and Economics filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of National League of Cities, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of 27+ Lay Roman Catholics filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of 137 Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Adventist Forum, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Tanenbaum Center for Interreligious filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 12 2022Reply of petitioners 303 Creative LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kristen Kellie Waggoner
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

kwaggoner@adflegal.org
202-393-8690
Party name: 303 Creative LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Eric Reuel Olson
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

eric.olson@coag.gov
720-508-6548
Party name: Aubrey Elenis, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: American Psychological Association, National Association of Social Workers, and Colorado Psychological Association
Peter T. Barbur
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

pbarbur@cravath.com
(212) 474-1000
Party name: 137 Members of Congress
Michael Evan Bern
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004-1304

michael.bern@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: Modern Military Association of America and Minority Veterans of America
Mary L. Bonauto
    Counsel of Record
GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders
18 Tremont Street, Suite 950
Boston, MA 02108

mbonauto@glad.org
(617) 426-1350
Party name: GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, The Human Rights Campaign, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., The National Center for Lesbian Rights, and The National LGBTQ Task Force
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
Dean Robert Broyles
    Counsel of Record
The National Center for Law and Policy
539 West Grand Avenue
Escondido, CA 92025

dbroyles@nclplaw.org
7607474529
Party name: Scholars of Family and Sexuality
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Claremont Institue's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Michael Shawn Catlett
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office, Office of the Solicitor General
2005 N. Central Ave
Phoenix, AZ 85004

michael.catlett@azag.gov
(602)542-7751
Party name: Arizona, Nebraska, et al.
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
2213 Morris Ave.
Floor 1
Birmingham, AL 35203

matt@alabamalawandliberty.org
256-510-1828
Party name: Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: National Association of Evangelicals, et al.
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado
Miles Edward Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
2 West Washington Street
Suite 400
Greenville, SC 29601

miles.coleman@nelsonmullins.com
8643732352
Party name: Creative Professionals and George and Maxine Maynard
John Michael Connolly
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

mike@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: United States Senators and Representatives
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

ccrawford@afphq.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Kenneth Clark Daines
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Highway
Haymarket, VA 20169

kdaines@holtzmanvogel.com
5403418808
Party name: The First Amendment Scholars
Elizabeth Napier Dewar
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

bessie.dewar@mass.gov
617-963-2204
Party name: Massachusetts et al.
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
111 Magnolia Lane
Hubert, NC 28539

lawyerdeborah@outlook.com
9103264554
Party name: Institute for Faith and Family
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
111 Magnolia Lane
Hubert, NC 28539

lawyerdeborah@outlook.com
9103264554
Party name: Institute for Faith and Family and Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Patrick C Elliott
    Counsel of Record
Freedom From Religion Foundation
PO BOX 750
Madison, WI 53701

pelliott@ffrf.org
6082568900
Party name: The Freedom From Religion Foundation, Center for Inquiry, American Humanist Association and American Atheists
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: 30 Religious, Civil Rights, and Grassroots Organizations
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Robbins Russell
2000 K Street NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@kramerlevin.com
2027754503
Party name: The Western Jurisdiction of the United Methodist Church, et al.
William L. Esser IV
    Counsel of Record
Parker Poe Adams & Bemstein LLP
620 S. Tryon Street, Suite 800
Charlotte, NC 28202

willesser@parkerpoe.com
(704) 372-9000
Party name: Website and Graphic Designers
Steven Werner Fitschen
    Counsel of Record
National Legal Foundation
524 Johnstown Rd
Chesapeake, VA 23322

sfitschen@nationallegalfoundation.org
7574636133
Party name: Concerned Women for America
David Austin French
    Counsel of Record
The Dispatch
1020 19th Street NW
Suite 875
Washington, DC 20036

david@thedispatch.com
931-446-7572
Party name: 15 Family Policy Organizations
Sean Paul Gates
    Counsel of Record
Charis Lex P.C.
301 N. Lake Ave., Ste. 1100
Pasadena, CA 91101

Sgates@charislex.com
(626) 508-1715
Party name: Law and Economics Scholars
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
3362799331
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: First Amendment Scholars (Six)
Christopher Raymond Green
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
481 Chucky Mullins Drive
University, MS 38677

crgreen@olemiss.edu
6625509836
Party name: Professor Christopher R. Green
Samuel David Green
    Counsel of Record
Reason for Life
P.O. Box 500040
Palmdale, CA 93550

sgreen@reasonforlife.org
661-524-5770
Party name: Walk for Life West Coast, Arizona Life Coalition, and Coalition for Life of Iowa
Dennis Grossman
    Counsel of Record
6701 Sunset Drive
Suite 104
Miami, FL 33143

dagrossmanlaw@aol.com
(516) 466-6690
Party name: Christian Family Coalition (CFC) Florida, Inc.
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, et al.
Sarah Patricia Hogarth
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

shogarth@mwe.com
202-756-8354
Party name: Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al.
Tassity Shardae JohnsonJenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Washington, CA 20001

tjohnson@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: American Psychological Association, National Association of Social Workers, and Colorado Psychological Association
Nathan W. Kellum
    Counsel of Record
Center For Religious Expression
699 Oakleaf Office Lane
Suite 107
Memphis, TN 38117

nkellum@crelaw.org
901-684-5485
Party name: Center for Religious Expression
Stephen Blake Kinnaird
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
2050 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

stephenkinnaird@paulhastings.com
202-551-1842
Party name: Ilan H. Meyer, PhD and Other Social Scientists and Legal Scholars
Eric Nieuwenhuis Kniffin
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
90 South Cascade Avenue, Suite 1100
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

ekniffin@lrrc.com
7193863017
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Colorado Catholic Conference, The General Council of the Assemblies of God, The General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists, The Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, and Samaritan’s Purse
Sherry Levin Wallach
    Counsel of Record
New York State Bar Association
One Elk Street
Albany, NY 12207

slw@laswest.org
518-463-3200
Party name: New York State Bar Association
Jonathan Philip Lienhard
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

jlienhard@holtzmanvogel.com
15403418808
Party name: The Catholic League for Religious and Civil Rights
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
1050 K Street NW
Suite 1040
Washington, DC 20001

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(929) 294-2537
Party name: Public Accommodations Law Scholars
David Charles McGrail
    Counsel of Record
McGrail & Bensinger LLP
888-C Eighth Avenue
#107
New York, NY 10019

dmcgrail@mcgrailbensinger.com
6462858476
Party name: The Freedom and Justice Foundation, Inc.
Aileen Marie McGrath
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
580 California Street
Suite 1500
San Francisco, CA 94104

AMcGrath@akingump.com
415-765-9553
Party name: National League of Cities et al.
Erin Elizabeth Mersino
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Law Center
24 Frank Lloyd Wright Drive
Suite J3200
Ann Arbor, MI 48105

emersino@thomasmore.org
734-827-2001
Party name: Thomas More Law Center
Christopher E. Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: Tyndale House Publishers; Peachtree Publishing Services, LLC; The Foundry Publishing; Harvest House Publishers, Inc.; The Moody Bible Institute of Chicago; Warner Press, Inc.; Two Words Publishing, LLC; Blue Ridge Christian News; Tennessee Baptist and Reflector
Christopher Ernest Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: Tyndale House Publishers; Peachtree Publishing Services, LLC; The Foundry Publishing; Harvest House Publishers, Inc.; Urban Ministries, Inc.; Whitaker House; The Moody Bible Institute of Chicago; Warner Press, Inc.
Kerry Lee Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Pentiuk, Couvreur, & Kobiljak, P.C.
2915 Biddle Avenue
Suite 200
Wyandotte, MI 48192

kmorgan@pck-law.com
(734) 281-7100
Party name: Lonang Institute
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Tim Newton
    Counsel of Record
Murphy and Grantland, P.A.
Post Office Box 6648
Columbia, SC 29260

tnewton@murphygrantland.com
(803) 454-1242
Party name: C12 Group, Christian Employers Alliance, and Pinnacle Forum
Andrew Martin Nussbaum
    Counsel of Record
Nussbaum, Speir, and Gleason
2 N. Cascade Avenue, Suite 1430
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

andrew@nussbaumspeir.com
7194282386
Party name: Public Trust Institute
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Public Advocate of the United States, et al.
Michael Steven Overing
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Michael S. Overing, APC
790 E. Colorado Blvd.
Ste. 320
Pasadena, CA 91101

movering@digitalmedialaw.com
6265648600
Party name: Association of Certified Biblical Counselors Inc.
Juan Otoniel Perla
    Counsel of Record
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP
1717 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Suite 1300
Washington DC, DC 20006

jperla@curtis.com
202-452-7373
Party name: Adventist Forum, et al.
Josephine Kendra Petrick
    Counsel of Record
Hanson Bridgett LLP
425 Market Street
26th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

jpetrick@hansonbridgett.com
(415) 777-3200
Party name: Brief for Scholars of Behavioral Science and Economics
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

erassbach@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
James K. Riley
    Counsel of Record
145 Franklin Avenue
Pearl River, NY 10965

jrjrprny@gmail.com
845-653-1722
Party name: 27+ Lay Roman Catholics
Megan Louise Rodgers
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

mrodgers@cov.com
(202) 662-6000
Party name: National Women's Law Center et al.
Sanford Jay Rosen
    Counsel of Record
Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP
101 Mission Street, 6th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

srosen@rbgg.com
415-433-6830
Party name: Former U.S. Representative Anthony (“Tony”) Coelho, et al.
Daniel Adam Rubens
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 W 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

drubens@orrick.com
2125063679
Party name: Professor Kent Greenfield
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Council for Christian Colleges and Universities, The Association for Biblical Higher Education, and Several Individual Religious Colleges and Universities
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 North Wells Street
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Mark Janus, National National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, Care Net, and Heartbeat International, Inc.
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
First Liberty Institute, 2001 W. Plano Pkwy.
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: Aaron and Melissa Klein
Jeffrey A. Shafer
    Counsel of Record
Langdon Law LLC
8913 Cincinnati-Dayton Rd.
West Chester, OH 45069

jshafer@langdonlaw.com
513-577-7380
Party name: Legal Scholar Adam J. Macleod
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute and Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
Catherine Wynne Short
    Counsel of Record
Life Legal Defense Foundation
P.O. Box 2105
Napa, CA 94558

kshort@lldf.org
(707) 224-6675
Party name: Life Legal Defense Foundation and Bioethics Defense Fund
Howard Nathan Slugh
    Counsel of Record
Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
2400 Virginia Ave NW
C619
Washington, DC 20037

hslugh@jcrl.org
954-328-9461
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Samuel Spital
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

sspital@naacpldf.org
212-965-2200
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

court@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: Liberty Counsel
Eric Alan Stone
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

estone@paulweiss.com
212-373-3326
Party name: Tobias Barrington Wolff
John Clay Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
S|L Law PLLC
610 Uptown Blvd.
Suite 2000
Cedar Hill, TX 75104

john.sullivan@the-sl-lawfirm.com
469.523.1351
Party name: National Religious Broadcasters; American Family Association; The Briner Institute; Christian Professional Photographers; The Walk TV; and Turning Point USA
John Clay Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
S|L Law PLLC
610 Uptown Blvd.
Cedar Hill, TX 75104

john.sullivan@the-sl-lawfirm.com
14695231351
Party name: Multimedia Production Professionals
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Young America's Foundation
William E. Trachman
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

wtrachman@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation
Jeffrey Michael Trissell
    Counsel of Record
LiMandri & Jonna LLP
PO Box 9120
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067

jtrissell@limandri.com
8587599930
Party name: Ethics and Public Policy Center and African American and Civil Rights Organizations
Meaghan Elizabeth McLaine VerGow
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mvergow@omm.com
(202)-383-5300
Party name: First Amendment Scholars (Eight)
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: American Bar Association
Eugene Volokh
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law
385 Charles E. Young Dr. E
Los Angeles, CA 90095

volokh@law.ucla.edu
310-206-3926
Party name: Prof. Dale Carpenter, Prof. Eugene Volokh, Ilya Shapiro, American Unity Fund, and Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
William Wagner
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Upper Level
Lansing, MI 48917

Prof.WWJD@gmail.com
517-322-3207
Party name: Colorado State Legislators
Robert John Ward
    Counsel of Record
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

Robert.Ward@srz.com
2127562000
Party name: Tanenbaum Center for Interreligious
Walter M. Weber
    Counsel of Record
Free Speech Advocates
6375 New Hope Rd.
New Hope, KY 40052

monaghanoffice@earthlink.net
502.549.5454
Party name: Christian Legal Society and Free Speech Advocates
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
2300 N Street, NW
Suite 643A
Washington, DC 20037

emwenger@HoltzmanVogel.com
2027378808
Party name: Robert P. George
Jonathan Radford Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jonathan R. Whitehead, LLC
229 SE Douglas St., Suite 210
Lee's Summit, MO 64063

jon@whiteheadlawllc.com
8163988305
Party name: Family Research Council
Julie H. Wilensky
    Counsel of Record
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
1390 Market Street, 6th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94102

julie.wilensky@sfcityatty.org
415-554-4274
Party name: Mayor London Breed and the City and County of San Francisco
Owen Dennis YeatesInstitute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Ave NW
Ste 801
Washington, DC 20036

oyeates@ifs.org
202-301-3300
Party name: Institute for Free Speech

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543