Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-454
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-454
Title:Michael Sackett, et ux., Petitioners
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:September 24, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35469)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Michael Sackett, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2021 to November 24, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 24, 2021.
Oct 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 25 2021Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 25 2021Brief amici curiae of the Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2021Brief of respondents U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 29 2021Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Nov 30 2021Reply of petitioners Michael Sackett, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 24 2022Petition GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether the Ninth Circuit set forth the proper test for determining whether wetlands are "waters of the United States" under the Clean Water Act, 33 U. S. C. §1362(7).
Jan 28 2022Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Feb 04 2022Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including April 11, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including June 10, 2022.
Feb 10 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Blanket Consent
Apr 11 2022Brief of petitioners Michael Sackett, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 13 2022Brief amici curiae of National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2022Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Brief amici curiae of Congressional Western Caucus Members filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Forestry Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Fourteen National Agricultural Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Associated Industries of Florida and Florida H2O Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Wyoming Stock Growers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Savannah Economic Development Authority, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Apr 18 2022Amicus brief of Farm Bureaus of Arkansas, et al. not accepted for filing. (Corrected version to be submitted-- April 20, 2022.)
Apr 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Farm Bureaus of Arkansas, et al. filed (4/21/22.)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 18 2022Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Counties, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Duarte Nursery, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amici curiae of American Exploration and Mining Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Western Urban Water Coalition in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Sen. Shelley Moore Capito, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amici curiae of American Petroleum Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia and 25 Other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Property and Environment Research Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Railroads filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Freeport-McMoRan Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of State of Alaska filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Cattlemen's Beef Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 10 2022Brief of respondents U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 14 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, October, 3, 2022.
Jun 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Scientific Societies filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 16 2022Brief amici curiae of Waterkeeper Alliance, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of American Sustainable Business Network, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Water Resource Management Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Environmental and Community Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Former EPA Administrators William K. Reilly, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Colorado filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Menominee Indian Tribe of Wisconsin, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Clean Water Agencies filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Idaho Conservation League filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Outdoor Recreation and Conservation Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of 167 U.S. Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 22 2022Record requested from the 9th Circuit.
Jun 23 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Jul 08 2022Reply of petitioners Michael Sackett, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2022CIRCULATED
Oct 03 2022Argued. For petitioners: Damien M. Schiff, Sacramento, Cal. For respondents: Brian H. Fletcher, Acting Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Damien Michael Schiff
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

dschiff@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Michael Sackett, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian Halligan Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20530

Cheri.Williams2@usdoj.gov
202-514-2201
Party name: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Other
Benjamin Daniel Battles
    Counsel of Record
Pollock Cohen LLP
50 Lakeside Avenue
Burlington, VT 05401

ben@pollockcohen.com
802-793-5512
Party name: American Sustainable Business Network, National Latino Farmers and Ranchers Trade Association, Ecological Restoration Business Association, and Craft Brewers
Timothy S. Bishop
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

tbishop@mayerbrown.com
3127017829
Party name: Fourteen National Agricultural Organizations
Janette K. Brimmer
    Counsel of Record
Earthjustice
810 3rd Avenue
Suite 610
Seattle, WA 98104-1645

jbrimmer@earthjustice.org
206 504 3459
Party name: Menominee Indian Tribe of Wisconsin and 17 Federally Recognized Indian Tribes
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: Former EPA Administrators William K. Reilly and Carol M. Browner
Karen Budd-Falen
    Counsel of Record
Budd-Falen Law Offices, LLC
300 East 18th Street, Post Office Box 346
Cheyenne, WY 82003-0346

karen@buddfalen.com
(307) 632-5105
Party name: Wyoming Stock Growers Association, Wyoming Association of Conservation Districts, and Progressive Pathways
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
David Yolun Chung
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring, LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004-2595

dchung@crowell.com
202-624-2587
Party name: Forestry Organizations
Sara Anita Colangelo
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown University Law Center
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

sara.colangelo@law.georgetown.edu
2026616543
Party name: 167 U.S. Members of Congress in Support of Respondents
Terry Paul Cole
    Counsel of Record
Gunster Law Firm
215 S. Monroe Street, Suite 601
Tallahassee, FL 32301

gmunson@gunster.com
(850) 521-1980
Party name: Associated Industries of Florida and Florida H2O Coalition
Alexandra Dapolito Dunn
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
700 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

alexandra.dunn@bakerbotts.com
(202) 639-1324
Party name: National Association of Clean Water Agencies
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation, Conservatives for Property Rights, Committee for Justice
Royal C. Gardner
    Counsel of Record
Stetson Univ. College of Law
1401 61st Street South
Gulfport, FL 33707

gardner@law.stetson.edu
727-562-7864
Party name: Scientific Societies
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tyler@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Congressional Western Caucus Members
Caitlin Joan Halligan
    Counsel of Record
Selendy Gay Elsberg Pllc
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

challigan@selendygay.com
(212) 390-9000
Party name: Water Resource Management Organizations
Caleb Adam Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Environmental Law and Community Engagement Clinic
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

cjaffe@law.virginia.edu
4349244776
Party name: Idaho Conservation League
Thomas Michael Johnson Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

tmjohnson@wiley.law
(202) 719-7000
Party name: Sen. Shelley Moore Capito, Rep. Sam Graves, and a Coalition of 199 Members of Congress
Timothy Vartkes Kassouni
    Counsel of Record
Kassouni Law
455 Capitol Mall
Suite 604
Sacramento, CA 95814

timothy@kassounilaw.com
916-930-0030
Party name: Duarte Nursery, Inc.
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Farm Bureaus of Arkansas, Arizona, California, Colorado, Illinois, Indiana, Iowa, Kansas, Minnesota, Missouri, Nebraska, New Mexico, North Carolina, North Dakota, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas and Virginia
Lawrence R. Liebesman
    Counsel of Record
Smouse & Mason, LLC
223 Duke of Gloucester Street
Annapolis, MD 21401

lrl@smouseandmason.com
4102696620
Party name: National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association and The American Road and Transportation Builders Association
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

jmarwell@velaw.com
202-639-6507
Party name: Freeport-McMoRan Inc.
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose.mathieson@calapplaw.com
4156496700
Party name: Waterkeeper Alliance, San Francisco Baykeeper, Bayou City Waterkeeper, and 47 Other Waterkeeper Organizations
Jonathan Gerard Andre Monette
    Counsel of Record
Best Best & Krieger, LLP
1800 K Street, NW
Suite 725
Washington, DC 20006

andre.monette@bbklaw.com
(202) 785-0600
Party name: The National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, United States Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al.
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Eric Reuel Olson
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

eric.olson@coag.gov
7205086548
Party name: Colorado
John Pagliaro
    Counsel of Record
The New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111

johnpagliaro@nelfonline.org
617-695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 25 Other States
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Jennifer Anne Simon
    Counsel of Record
Kazmarek Mowrey Cloud Laseter LLP
1230 Peachtree Street N.E., Suite 900
Atlanta, GA 30309

jsimon@kmcllaw.com
4048120126
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: American Petroleum Institute, Association of Oil Pipe Lines, and American Gas Association
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells St.
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Christopher D. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie, LLP
2901 North Central Avenue, Suite 2000
Phoenix, AZ 85012

cthomas@perkinscoie.com
6023518045
Party name: American Exploration and Mining Association et al.
Nicholas Steele Torrey
    Counsel of Record
Southern Environmental Law Center
601 W. Rosemary St., Suite 220
Chapel Hill, NC 27516

ntorrey@selcnc.org
9199671450
Party name: Environmental and Community Organizations
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 W. Monroe, Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
(608) 999-1240
Party name: Savannah Economic Development Authority, Greenland Developers, LLC, and Resource & Land Consultants LLC
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: New York, California, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaiʻi, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Minnesota, New Jersey, New Mexico, North Carolina, Oregon, Vermont, Washington, Wisconsin, and the District of Columbia
Fred R. Wagner
    Counsel of Record
Venable LLP
600 Mass. Ave., NW
Washington, DC, DC 20001

frwagner@venable.com
2023444032
Party name: Association of American Railroads
Thomas Jon Ward
    Counsel of Record
National Association of Home Builders
1201 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

tward@nahb.org
202 266-8230
Party name: National Association of Home Builders
Meredith R. Weinberg
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101

mweinberg@perkinscoie.com
2063593229
Party name: Western Urban Water Coalition
David Andrew Wilkinson
    Counsel of Record
State of Alaska, Department of Law
1031 West 4th Avenue, Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501-1994

david.wilkinson@alaska.gov
907-269-5100
Party name: State of Alaska
Jennifer Suzanne Windom
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Robbins Russell LLP
2000 K Street, NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

jwindom@kramerlevin.com
202-775-4500
Party name: Outdoor Recreation and Conservation Organizations
Jonathan Calvin Wood
    Counsel of Record
Property and Environment Research Center
2048 Analysis Dr
Ste A
Bozeman, MT 59718

jonathan@perc.org
9722179306
Party name: Property and Environment Research Center
Scott Jonathan Yager
    Counsel of Record
National Cattlemen's Beef Association
1275 Pennsylvania Ave NW Suite 801
Washington, DC 20004

scott.yager@gmail.com
2023470228
Party name: National Cattlemen's Beef Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543