Docket for 21-443
|
Sep 20 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 12 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent United States of America, ex rel. David L. Felten, M.D., Ph.D. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Oct 13 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021. | | | Oct 14 2021 | Brief amici curiae of American Hospital Association, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Oct 18 2021 | Response Requested. (Due November 17, 2021) | | | Nov 08 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 17, 2021 to December 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 09 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 17, 2021. | | | Dec 17 2021 | Brief of respondent United States of America, ex rel. David L. Felten, M.D., Ph.D. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 04 2022 | Reply of petitioner William Beaumont Hospital filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 05 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022. | | | Jan 24 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|