Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-429
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-429
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Victor Manuel Castro-Huerta
Docketed:September 21, 2021
Linked with 21A168
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2017-1203)
   Decision Date:April 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, State of Oklahoma
Blanket Consent
Oct 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 21, 2021 to November 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2021.
Oct 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Environmental Federation of Oklahoma, Inc., et al filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Cities of Tulsa and Owasso, Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2021Brief amici curiae of the Oklahoma District Attorneys Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cherokee Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 15 2021Brief of respondent Victor Manuel Castro-Huerta in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Muscogee (Creek) Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Chickasaw Nation and Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 19 2021Application (21A168) to file reply brief in excess of word limits, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Response of Victor Manuel Castro-Huerta to application filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 29 2021Application (21A168) denied by Justice Gorsuch.
Dec 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 08 2021Reply of petitioner Oklahoma filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 21 2022Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. The case will be set for argument in the April 2022 argument session. Petitioner's brief on the merits is to be filed on or before Monday, February 28, 2022. Respondent's brief on the merits is to be filed on or before Monday, March 28, 2022. The reply brief is to be filed in accordance with Rule 25.3.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Victor Manuel Castro-Huerta
Other
Blaine H. Evanson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

bevanson@gibsondunn.com
949-451-3805
Party name: Cities of Tulsa and Owasso, Oklahoma
Frank Sharp Holleman IV
    Counsel of Record
Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP
1425 K Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

fholleman@sonosky.com
2026820240
Party name: Chickasaw Nation and Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma
Riyaz Amir Kanji
    Counsel of Record
Kanji & Kantzen, PLLC
303 Detroit Street
Suite 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

rkanji@kanjikatzen.com
734-769-5400
Party name: Muscogee (Creek) Nation
Chrissi Ross Nimmo
    Counsel of Record
Cherokee Nation
P.O. Box 948
Tahlequah, OK 74465

chrissi-nimmo@cherokee.org
9184586998
Party name: Cherokee Nation
Lynn H. Slade
    Counsel of Record
Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk, P.A.
500 Fourth Street N,.W., Suite 1000
Albuquerque, NM 87102

lynn.slade@modrall.com
505-848-1800
Party name: Environmental Federation of Oklahoma, Inc., et al
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: States of Texas, Kansas, Louisiana, and Nebraska
Katherine Crawford Yarger
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller LLP
1550 Dayton St.
Unit 362
Aurora, CO 80010

katie@lehotskykeller.com
(303) 717-4749
Party name: The Oklahoma District Attorneys Association, The Oklahoma Sheriffs' Association, The Association of Oklahoma Narcotic Enforcers and The 27 Oklahoma District Attorneys

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543