Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-328
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-328
Title:Robyn Morgan, Petitioner
v.
Sundance, Inc.
Docketed:September 1, 2021
Linked with 21A215
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2435)
   Decision Date:March 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 29 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law Professors.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2021Brief of respondent Sundance, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 15 2021Reply of petitioner Robyn Morgan filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 20 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Nov 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Nov 15 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law Professors GRANTED.
Nov 15 2021Petition GRANTED.
Nov 30 2021Motion for an extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 30 2021Application (21A215) to extend the time to file a reply brief on the merits to March 11, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 15 2021Application (21A215) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file the reply brief on the merits until March 11, 2022.
Dec 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including February 4, 2022.
Dec 29 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Sundance, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Dec 30 2021Brief of petitioner Robyn Morgan filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 05 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of The National Academy of Arbitrators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Minnesota, Maryland, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Robyn Morgan
Blanket Consent
Jan 26 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Jan 28 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, March 21, 2022.
Feb 04 2022Brief of respondent Sundance, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2022CIRCULATED
Feb 11 2022Brief amicus curiae of Restaurant Law Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2022Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2022Reply of petitioner Robyn Morgan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 21 2022Argued. For petitioner: Karla A. Gilbride, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C.
May 23 2022Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Kagan, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.
Jun 24 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Karla Ann Gilbride
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice, P.C.
1620 L St. NW, Ste. 630
Washington, DC 20036

kgilbride@publicjustice.net
2027978600
Party name: Robyn Morgan
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Sundance, Inc.
Other
Jennifer Dale Bennett
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler, PLLC
100 Pine Street, Suite 1250
San Francisco, CA 94111

jennifer@guptawessler.com
(415) 569-6979
Party name: Law Professors
Richard Harris Frankel
    Counsel of Record
Drexel University School of Law
3320 Market Street
Philadelphia, PA 19104

richard.frankel@drexel.edu
215-571-4807
Party name: Amici Curiae Law Professors
Elizabeth Catherine Kramer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Minnesota Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street
Suite 1100
Saint Paul, MN 55101

liz.kramer@ag.state.mn.us
6517571010
Party name: Amici Curiae States of Minnesota, Maryland, et al.
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

vlevy@hsgllp.com
(646) 837-5120
Party name: The National Academy of Arbitrators
Todd E. Lundell
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton L.L.P.
650 Town Center Drive
10th Floor
Costa Mesa, CA 92626

TLundell@sheppardmullin.com
714-513-5100
Party name: Restaurant Law Center
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Gerson H. Smoger
    Counsel of Record
Smoger & Associates
13250 Branch View Lane
Dallas, TX 75234

gerson@texasinjurylaw.com
(972) 243-5297
Party name: American Association for Justice
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

zack.tripp@weil.com
(202) 682-7220
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543