Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1496
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1496
Title:Twitter, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Mehier Taamneh, et al.
Docketed:May 31, 2022
Linked with 21A501, 22A522
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-17192)
   Decision Date:June 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 27, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 10 2022Application (21A501) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 27, 2022 to May 26, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Mar 14 2022Application (21A501) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 26, 2022.
May 26 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 30, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 30, 2022 to August 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 15, 2022. See Rule 30.1.
Jun 27 2022Letter from counsel for respondent Google, LLC submitted pursuant to Rule 12.6 filed.
Main Document
Jun 29 2022Letter from counsel for respondent Facebook, Inc. submitted pursuant to Rule 12.6 filed.
Main Document
Aug 15 2022Brief of respondents Mehier Taamneh, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 30 2022Reply of petitioner Twitter, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Aug 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition GRANTED.
Nov 02 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Mehier Taamneh, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 03 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits (including respondents in support) is extended to and including November 29, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 11, 2023.
Nov 17 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Twitter, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Nov 17 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Google LLC
Blanket Consent
Nov 22 2022Letter of petitioner amending corporate disclosure statement filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Nov 29 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 29 2022Brief of petitioner Twitter, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2022Brief of respondents Facebook, Inc. and Google LLC supporting petitioners filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Facebook, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Dec 05 2022Brief amici curiae of Center for Democracy & Technology, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Former State Department Legal Advisers in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Computer & Communications Industry Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Institute of International Bankers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amici curiae of InterAction, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2022Application (22A522) of respondents Taamneh, et al. to file a brief on the merits in excess of the word limitation, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Dec 15 2022Application to file respondents' brief on the merits in excess of the word limit (22A522) granted by Justice Kagan, provided that the brief does not exceed 20,000 words.
Dec 19 2022SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, February 22, 2023.
Dec 20 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Dec 21 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is available on PACER.
Dec 21 2022The record from the U.S.D.C. for the Northern District of California is available on PACER.
Jan 11 2023Brief of respondents Mehier Taamneh, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2023CIRCULATED
Jan 18 2023Motion for divided argument and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed by respondents Facebook, Inc. and Google LLC supporting petitioner.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Retired United States Generals Who Served in Iraq and Afghanistan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Plaintiffs' General Committee in the MDL Addressing the Attacks of September 11, 2001 filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Plaintiffs' General Committee in the MDL Addressing the Attacks of September 11, 2001 filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of 470 Victims of Terrorist Attacks filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of 123 Victims of Terrorist Attacks filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Anti-Terrorism Act Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Former National Security Officials filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Concerned Women for America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Senator Charles E. Grassley filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Anti-Defamation League filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of The American Association of Jewish Lawyers and Jurists, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2023Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Jan 26 2023Motion for divided argument filed by respondents Facebook, Inc. and Google LLC supporting petitioner DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2100 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20037

SETH.WAXMAN@WILMERHALE.COM
202-663-6800
Party name: Twitter, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Google LLC supporting petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

paul.clement@clementmurphy.com
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Facebook, Inc. supporting petitioner
Eric Schnapper
    Counsel of Record
Univ. of Washington School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
206-616-3167
Party name: Mehier Taamneh, et al.
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: Facebook, Inc.
Other
James Patrick Bonner
    Counsel of Record
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
81 Main Street
Suite 515
White Plains, NY 10601

JBONNER@FBRLLP.COM
646-415-1399
Party name: Anti-Defamation League
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: The Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Glenn Ari Danas
    Counsel of Record
Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.
22525 Pacific Coast Highway
Malibu, CA 90265

GDANAS@CLARKSONLAWFIRM.COM
213-788-4050
Party name: Retired United States Generals Who Served in Iraq and Afghanistan
Mario Alberto Diaz
    Counsel of Record
Concerned Women for America
1000 N. Payne Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

mdiaz@cwfa.org
(202) 488-7000
Party name: Concerned Women for America
Geoffrey Paul Eaton
    Counsel of Record
Sparacino PLLC
1920 L St. NW
Ste. 835
Washington, DC 20036

GEOFF.EATON@SPARACINOPLLC.COM
202-422-8676
Party name: 123 Victims of Terrorist Attacks
Brian Halligan Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20530

Cheri.Williams2@usdoj.gov
202-514-2201
Party name: United States
Marc J. Gottridge
    Counsel of Record
Herbert Smith Freehills New York LLP
450 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

Marc.Gottridge@hsf.com
917-542-7600
Party name: Institute of International Bankers, European Banking Federation, The Bank Policy Institute
Timothy Paul Harkness
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP
601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022

timothy.harkness@freshfields.com
212-277-4000
Party name: InterAction and Charity & Security Network
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
San Francisco, CA 94111, CA 94111

khartnett@cooley.com
(415) 693-2071
Party name: Center for Democracy & Technology, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern Carolina, Electronic Frontier Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute At Columbia University, R Street Institute, and Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller LLP
200 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

scott@lehotskykeller.com
5126938350
Party name: Brief of Computer & Communications Industry Association, Netchoice, Software & Information Industry Association, Developers Alliance, Chamber Of Progress, Internet Infrastructure Coalition, And Act The App Association
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: Former State Department Legal Advisers
Hal R. Morris
    Counsel of Record
Saul Ewing LLP
161 North Clark Street
Suite 4200
Chicago, IL 60601

HAL.MORRIS@SAUL.COM
3128767100
Party name: The American Association of Jewish Lawyers and Jurists, The Simon Wiesenthal Center, and The Zachor Legal Institute
Gary Martin Osen
    Counsel of Record
OSEN LLC
190 Moore Street
Suite 272
Hackensack, NJ 07601

gosen@osenlaw.com
(201) 265-6400
Party name: Former National Security Officials
Michael A. Petrino
    Counsel of Record
Stein Mitchell Beato & Missner LLP
901 15th Street, NW, STE 700
Washington, DC 20005

MPETRINO@STEINMITCHELL.COM
(202) 737-7777
Party name: Senator Charles E. Grassley
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

CPHILLIPS@SIDLEY.COM
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: The Plaintiffs' General Committee in the MDL Addressing the Attacks of September 11, 2001
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Foreign Trade Council, United States Council for International Business, and Business Roundtable
David Brian Smallman
    Counsel of Record
Smallman + Snyder Law Group || Smallman Law PLLC
43 West 43rd Street
Suite 242
New York, NY 10036-7424

DavidBrian@DBSLawPLLC.com
9174140182
Party name: Gregory Clayborn Individually and as Successor-in-Interest of the Estate of Sierra Clayborn
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

SVLADECK@LAW.UTEXAS.EDU
5124759198
Party name: Anti-Terrorism Act Scholars
Daniel Hirotsu Woofter
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

DW@GOLDSTEINRUSSELL.COM
(202) 362-0636
Party name: 470 Victims of Terrorist Attacks

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543