Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1333
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1333
Title:Reynaldo Gonzalez, et al., Petitioners
v.
Google LLC
Docketed:April 6, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-16700)
   Decision Date:June 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 3, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 6, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 6, 2022 to July 5, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2022.
Jul 05 2022Brief of respondent Google LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 19 2022Reply of petitioners Reynaldo Gonzalez, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition GRANTED.
Oct 18 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Google LLC
Blanket Consent
Nov 02 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Reynaldo Gonzalez, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 03 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and the briefs on the merits filed. (November 8, 2022 - corrected submission accepted.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including November 29, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 11, 2023.
Nov 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2022Motion for a further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 23 2022Motion for a further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is further extended to and including November 30, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is further extended to and including January 12, 2023.
Nov 30 2022Brief of petitioners Reynaldo Gonzalez, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2022Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 01 2022Brief amici curiae of National Police Association, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Common Sense Media and Frances Haugen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Fairplay filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of CITP Tech Policy Clinic in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Senator Josh Hawley filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Free Speech for People filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amici curiae of States of Tennessee, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Major General Tamir Hayman (ret.),et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of vacatur filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amici curiae of The Cyber Civil Rights Initiative and Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Counter Extremism Project (CEP), et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amici curiae of The National Center on Sexual Exploitation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Anti-Defamation League in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Seattle School District No. 1, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of CHILD USA filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Free Press Action in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Former National Security Officials in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Institute for Free Speech, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Tawainna Anderson individually and as Administratrix of the Estate of Nylah Anderson a deceased minor filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amici curiae of America's Future, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for Renewing America, Inc. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senator Ted Cruz, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Zionist Organization of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Integrity Institute, et al. in support of neither party (12/14/2022) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Children’s Advocacy Institute at the University of San Diego School of Law in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 19 2022SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, February 21, 2023.
Dec 20 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Dec 21 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is available on PACER.
Dec 22 2022The record from the U.S.D.C. Northern District of California is available on PACER.
Jan 12 2023Brief of respondent Google LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2023Brief amicus curiae of Prof. Eric Goldman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2023CIRCULATED
Jan 17 2023Amicus brief of Public Knowledge not accepted for filing. (January 17, 2023 - corrected efiling to be submitted.)
Jan 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Internet Infrastructure Coalition, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of TechFreedom filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Center for Democracy & Technology, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Public Knowledge filed (Jan. 30, 2023). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Amicus brief not accepted for filing. (January 19, 2023 - to be resubmitted as brief for amici Chamber of Progress, et al.)
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Progress et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Developers Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Reddit, Inc. and Reddit moderators filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Wikimedia Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Internet Society filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Bipartisan Policy Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Senator Ron Wyden and Former Representative Christopher Cox filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Software & Information Industry Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Computer & Communications Industry Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Marketplace Industry Association and Match Group, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Civil Rights and Social Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Internet Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Progressive Policy Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Twitter, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Meta Platforms, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of M. Chris Riley, Floor64, Inc. d/b/a The Copia Institute, and Engine Advocacy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Reason Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Information Science Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Trust & Safety Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Craigslist, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Internet Works, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Microsoft Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Economists Ginger Zhe Jin, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Yelp Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Automattic Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of The American Action Forum filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of National Security Experts filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Authors Alliance and Internet Creators filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Former Senator Rick Santorum and Protect the First Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of ZipRecruiter, Inc. and Indeed, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of NYU Stern Center for Business and Human Rights filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and the Media Law Resource Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of ACT | The App Association filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of ARTICLE 19: Global Campaign For Free Expression, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Center For Growth and Opportunity, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2023Brief amici curiae of Economists filed (Jan. 26, 2023). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2023Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric Schnapper
    Counsel of Record
Univ. of Washington School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
206-660-8845
Party name: Reynaldo Gonzalez, et al.
Robert J. TolchinThe Berkman Law Office, LLC
829 East 15th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11230

rtolchin@berkmanlaw.com
7188553627
Party name: Reynaldo Gonzalez, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Google LLC
Brian Michael WillenWilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor
New York, NY 10019-6022

bwillen@wsgr.com
(212) 497-7700
Party name: Google LLC
Other
Andrew C. Nichols
    Counsel of Record
Charis Lex P.C.
11921 Freedom Drive
Suite 550
Reston, VA 20190

anichols@charislex.com
(571) 549-2645
Party name: Center For Growth and Opportunity, et al.
Ginger D. Anders
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

GINGER.ANDERS@MTO.COM
2022201107
Party name: Senator Ron Wyden and Former Representative Christopher Cox
Venkat Balasubramani
    Counsel of Record
Focal PLLC
900 1st Ave. S., Suite 201
Seattle, WA 98134

venkat@focallaw.com
(206) 529-4827
Party name: Prof. Eric Goldman
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
TechFreedom
110 Maryland Ave NE #205
Washington, DC 20002

cbarthold@techfreedom.org
2028032867
Party name: TechFreedom
John Franklin Bash
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
300 W. 6th St., Suite 2010
Austin, TX 78701

johnbash@quinnemanuel.com
(737) 667-6100
Party name: Internet Works, Etsy, Inc., Glassdoor, Inc., Pinterest, Inc., Roblox Corporation, Scribd, Inc., Skillshare, Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, and Vimeo Inc.
Larry Bendesky
    Counsel of Record
Saltz, Mongeluzzi, Barrett, & Bendesky, PC
One Liberty Place, 52nd Floor
1650 Market Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103

lbendesky@smbb.com
2154968282
Party name: Tawainna Anderson individually and as Administratrix of the Estate of Nylah Anderson a deceased minor
Benjamin William Berkowitz
    Counsel of Record
Keker & Van Nest LLP
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

BBERKOWITZ@KEKER.COM
4153915400
Party name: Authors Alliance and Internet Creators
Andree Kahn Blumstein
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

andree.blumstein@ag.tn.gov
615-741-3492
Party name: The State of Tennessee, et al.
Anastasia Paulinna Boden
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

aboden@cato.org
202-216-1414
Party name: Cato Institute
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: National Police Association, Inc. and National Fallen Officer Foundation
Mark William Brennan
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

MARK.BRENNAN@HOGANLOVELLS.COM
2026376409
Party name: Trust & Safety Foundation
Andrew Phillip Bridges
    Counsel of Record
Fenwick & West, LLP
801 California Street
Silicon Valley Center
Mountain View, CA 94041

ABRIDGES@FENWICK.COM
(415) 875-2389
Party name: Internet Infrastructure Coalition; cPanel, LLC; Identity Digital Inc.; Texas.Net, Inc.; Tucows Inc.
David Ryan Brody
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K St. NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

dbrody@lawyerscommittee.org
202-662-8320
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Alan Jay Butler
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center
1519 New Hampshire Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036

butler@epic.org
2024831140
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center
Angela J. Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law
600 New Jersey Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

campbeaj@georgetown.edu
301-320-9015
Party name: Fairplay
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

PAUL.CLEMENT@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Tod Cohen
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, D.C., DC 20036

tcohen@steptoe.com
202-429-3000
Party name: Software & Information Industry Association
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1301 K Street, N.W.
Suite 500 East
Washington, DC 20005

BOBCORNREVERE@DWT.COM
202-973-4225
Party name: Chamber of Progress; Global Project Against Hate and Extremism; HONR Network; Information Technology Innovation Foundation; IP Justice; LGBT Tech Institute; Multicultural Media Telecom and Internet Council
Jolina Carbonell Cuaresma
    Counsel of Record
Common Sense Media
699 8th Street Suite C150
San Francisco, CA 94103

jcuaresma@commonsense.org
4158630600
Party name: Common Sense Media and Frances Haugen
James Patrick Davy
    Counsel of Record
All Rise Trial & Appellate
P.O. Box 15216
Philadelphia, PA 19125

jimdavy@allriselaw.org
2157923579
Party name: Integrity Institute and AlgoTransparency
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

MDREEBEN@OMM.COM
202-383-5400
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Jonathan Yates Ellis
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

JELLIS@MCGUIREWOODS.COM
202-828-2887
Party name: NYU Stern Center for Business and Human Rights
Steven Andrew Engel
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

STEVEN.ENGEL@DECHERT.COM
(202) 261-3300
Party name: The American Action Forum
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
2000 K Street NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

RENGLERT@KRAMERLEVIN.COM
2027754503
Party name: Progressive Policy Institute
Harold Feld
    Counsel of Record
Public Knowledge
1818 N St., NW
Suite 410
Washington, DC 20036

hfeld@publicknowledge.org
202-559-1044
Party name: Public Knowledge
Brian Halligan Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20530

Cheri.Williams2@usdoj.gov
202-514-2201
Party name: United States
Steven M. Freeman
    Counsel of Record
Anti-Defamation League
605 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10158

sfreeman@adl.org
(212) 885-7700
Party name: Anti-Defamation League
Marc Aaron FullerJackson Walker LLP
2323 Ross Avenue, Ste. 600
Dallas, TX 75201

MFULLER@JW.COM
(214) 952-6000
Party name: Article 19: Global Campaign For Free Expression et al.
Catherine Rachel Gellis
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
3020 Bridgeway #247
Sausalito, CA 94965

CATHY@CGCOUNSEL.COM
2026422849
Party name: M. Chris Riley, Floor64, Inc. d/b/a The Copia Institute, and Engine Advocacy
Peter Andrew Gentala
    Counsel of Record
National Center on Sexual Exploitation
1201 F. St., NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

pgentala@ncoselaw.org
202-393-7245
Party name: The National Center on Sexual Exploitation, The National Trafficking Sheltered Alliance, and RAINN
Albert Quoc Giang
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
633 West Fifth Street
Suite 1600
Los Angeles, CA 90071

AGIANG@KSLAW.COM
231-443-4355
Party name: Marketplace Industry Association and Match Group, LLC
Michael Julian Gottlieb
    Counsel of Record
WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
1875 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

MGOTTLIEB@WILLKIE.COM
2023031442
Party name: Internet Law Scholars
Jennifer Stisa Granick
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
39 Drumm Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

JGRANICK@ACLU.ORG
415-343-0758
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al
Marci A. Hamilton
    Counsel of Record
University of Pennsylvania
3814 Walnut Street
Philadelphia, PA 19104

hamilton.marci@gmail.com
215-539-1906
Party name: CHILD USA
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
San Francisco, CA 94111

KHARTNETT@COOLEY.COM
(415) 693-2000
Party name: Wikimedia Foundation
Joshua David Hawley
    Counsel of Record
N/A
115 Russell Senate Office Bldg.
Washington, DC 20510

ellen_james@hawley.senate.gov
202-224-6154
Party name: Senator Josh Hawley
Courtney Marie Hostetler
    Counsel of Record
Free Speech For People
1320 Centre St. #405
Newton, MA 02459

chostetler@freespeechforpeople.org
617-249-3015
Party name: Free Speech For People
Edward Paxson Howard IV
    Counsel of Record
University of San Diego School of Law
5998 Alcala Park
San Diego, CA 92110

Ed.Howard@sandiego.edu
(619) 260-4806
Party name: Children’s Advocacy Institute at the University of San Diego School of Law
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHUGHES@MWE.COM
(202) 756-8000
Party name: Scholars of Civil Rights and Social Justice
James Harold Hulme
    Counsel of Record
ArentFox Schiff LLP
1717 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006-5344

JAMES.HULME@ARENTFOX.COM
2028576144
Party name: Developers Alliance
Michael Robert Huston
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 13th Street, N.W.
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005-3960

mhuston@perkinscoie.com
202-434-1630
Party name: REDDIT, INC. AND REDDIT MODERATORS
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

EJAFFE@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: Reason Foundation
David Jaroslawicz
    Counsel of Record
Jaroslawicz & Jaros PLLC
225 Broadway
24th Floor
New York, NY 10007

dj@lawjaros.com
212-227-2780
Party name: Major General Tamir Hayman (ret.), Lt. General Moshe (Bogie) Ya’alon (ret.), Brig. General Yossi Kuperwasser (ret.), Roni Alsheikh, Major General Yaakov Amidror (ret.), and Haim Tomer
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJAY@GOODWINLAW.COM
2023464190
Party name: Computer & Communications Industry Association, NetChoice, Digital Media Association, the Information Technology Industry Council, the Interactive Advertising Bureau, and TechNet
Peter Karanjia
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP
500 Eighth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

PETER.KARANJIA@DLAPIPER.COM
202-799-4135
Party name: Craigslist, Inc.
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller LLP
200 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

SCOTT@LEHOTSKYKELLER.COM
(512) 693-8350
Party name: Economists Ginger Zhe Jin, Steven Tadelis, Liad Wagman and Joshua D. Wright
Endel Rohe Kolde
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 801
Washington, DC 20036

dkolde@ifs.org
202-301-1664
Party name: Institute for Free Speech and Professor Adam Candeub
Raechel Keay Kummer
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20004

RAECHEL.KUMMER@MORGANLEWIS.COM
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Internet Society
Michael Soonuk Kwun
    Counsel of Record
Kwun Bhansali Lazarus LLP
555 Montgomery St
Suite 750
San Francisco, CA 94111

MKWUN@KBLFIRM.COM
415-630-2350
Party name: Information Science Scholars
Kimberly Renee Lambert-Adams
    Counsel of Record
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, et al.
316 S. Baylen Street, Suite 600
Pensacola, FL 32502-5996

kadams@levinlaw.com
8504357056
Party name: Counter Extremism Project (CEP) and Hany Farid
Robert Parke Latham
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Walker LLP
2323 Ross Ave
Ste 600
Dallas, TX 75201

BLATHAM@JW.COM
(214) 953-6000
Party name: Article 19: Global Campaign For Free Expression et al.
Mark A. Lemley
    Counsel of Record
Lex Lumina PLLC
745 Fifth Avenue, Suite 500
New York, NY 10151

MLEMLEY@LEX-LUMINA.COM
(646) 898-2055
Party name: Automattic Inc.
Derek William Loeser
    Counsel of Record
Keller Rohrback LLP
1201 Third Avenue
Suite 3200
Seattle, WA 98101

dloeser@kellerrohrback.com
2066231900
Party name: Seattle School District No. 1, Kent School District No. 415
Aaron David Mackey
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

AMACKEY@EFF.ORG
415 436 9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation, American Library Association, Association of Research Libraries, Freedom to Read Foundation, and the Interest Archive
Jeffrey A. Mandell
    Counsel of Record
Stafford Rosenbaum, LLP
222 West Washington Avenue
Suite 900
Madison, WI 53703

jmandell@staffordlaw.com
608-210-6303
Party name: The Cyber Civil Rights Initiative and Legal Scholars
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

ROMAN.MARTINEZ@LW.COM
202-637-3377
Party name: ZipRecruiter, Inc. and Indeed, Inc.
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
Complex Appellate Litigation Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose.mathieson@calg.com
4156496700
Party name: Yelp Inc.
Mary B. McCord
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

mbm7@georgetown.edu
202-661-6607
Party name: Former National Security Officials
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates PLLC
801 17th Street, N.W.
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

mccotter@boydengrayassociates.com
202-706-5488
Party name: U.S. Senator Ted Cruz, Congressman Mike Johnson, and Fifteen Other Members of Congress
Gregory T. Nojeim
    Counsel of Record
Center for Democracy & Technology
1401 K St. NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

GNOJEIM@CDT.ORG
2026379800
Party name: Center for Democracy & Technology and 6 Technologists
Lynn Oberlander
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
1675 Broadway
19th Floor
New York, NY 10019

OBERLANDERL@BALLARDSPAHR.COM
(212) 223-0200
Party name: Bipartisan Policy Center
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: America's Future, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

DAONEIL@DEBEVOISE.COM
(202) 383-8000
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and the Media Law Resource Center
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

APINCUS@MAYERBROWN.COM
202-263-3220
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
Andrei Dan Popovici
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Andrei D. Popovici, P.C.
1450 W. Highway 290 #1200
Dripping Springs, TX 78620

andrei@apatent.com
650-530-9989
Party name: Center for Renewing America, Inc.
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

JROSENKRANZ@ORRICK.COM
212-506-5380
Party name: Microsoft Corporation
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Free Press Action
Brian Eugene Scarpelli
    Counsel of Record
ACT The App Association
1401 K Street NW, Suite 501
Washington, DC 20005

BSCARPELLI@ACTONLINE.ORG
5175071446
Party name: ACT | The App Association
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

GSCHAERR@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: Former Senator Rick Santorum and Protect the First Foundation
Jeremy Seth Spiegel
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Jeremy Spiegel
1 South Broad Street, Suite 1500
Philadelphia, PA 19107

spiegel@jeremyspiegellaw.com
2156093154
Party name: CITP Tech Policy Clinic
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: The State of Texas
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells St.
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Jennifer Beth Tatel
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Barker Knauer LLP
1800 M Street NW
Suite 800N
Washington, DC 20036

JTATEL@WBKLAW.COM
2023833344
Party name: Economist
Susan B. Tuchman
    Counsel of Record
Zionist Organization of America
633 Third Avenue
Suite 31-B
New York, NY 10017

stuchman@zoa.org
212-481-1500
Party name: Zionist Organization of America and the Rieders Foundation
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2100 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20037

SETH.WAXMAN@WILMERHALE.COM
202-663-6000
Party name: Twitter, Inc.
Jeffrey Robert White
    Counsel of Record
American Association for Justice
777 6th Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20001-3723

jeffrey.white@justice.org
2029442839
Party name: American Association for Justice
Scott Block Wilkens
    Counsel of Record
Knight First Amend. Inst. at Columbia Univ.
475 Riverside Drive
Suite 302
New York, NY 10115

SCOTT.WILKENS@KNIGHTCOLUMBIA.ORG
6467458500
Party name: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Christopher J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
HWG LLP
1919 M St NW #800
Washington, DC 20036

CWRIGHT@HWGLAW.COM
202-730-1325
Party name: National Security Experts

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543